EP3724114 - WIRE GUIDE FOR PRODUCING SHEATHED REINFORCEMENT ELEMENTS FOR TYRES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.10.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMPAGNIE GENERALE DES ETABLISSEMENTS MICHELIN 23 place des Carmes Déchaux 63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | [2023/46] |
Former [2020/43] | For all designated states COMPAGNIE GENERALE DES ETABLISSEMENTS MICHELIN 23 place des Carmes Déchaux 63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIMOZIN, Bastien C/O MANUFACTURE FRANCAISE DES PNEUMATIQUES MICHELIN CBS/CORP/J/PI-F35-Ladoux 63040 CLERMONT-FERRAND CEDEX 9 / FR | 02 /
RIGO, Sébastien C/O MANUFACTURE FRANCAISE DES PNEUMATIQUES MICHELIN CBS/CORP/J/PI-F35-Ladoux 63040 CLERMONT-FERRAND CEDEX 9 / FR | [2020/43] | Representative(s) | M.F.P. Michelin DCJ/PI - F35 - Ladoux 23 place des Carmes-Déchaux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2023/46] | Louret, Sylvain M.F.P. MICHELIN Service juridique - Propriété Intellectuelle DCJ/PI - F35 - Site de Ladoux 23, place des Carmes - Déchaux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | ||
Former [2020/43] | Cabinet Novitech 188 Grande rue Charles de Gaulle 94130 Nogent-sur-Marne / FR | Application number, filing date | 18815244.1 | 14.12.2018 | [2020/43] | WO2018EP85001 | Priority number, date | FR20170062181 | 14.12.2017 Original published format: FR 1762181 | [2020/43] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019115786 | Date: | 20.06.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3724114 | Date: | 21.10.2020 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3724114 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B65H57/12, B60C9/00, D02G3/12 | [2020/43] | CPC: |
B65H57/12 (EP);
B60C9/0007 (EP);
D02G3/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DRAHTFÜHRUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON UMMANTELTEN VERSTÄRKUNGSELEMENTEN FÜR REIFEN | [2020/43] | English: | WIRE GUIDE FOR PRODUCING SHEATHED REINFORCEMENT ELEMENTS FOR TYRES | [2020/43] | French: | GUIDE-FIL POUR LA FABRICATION D'ELEMENTS DE RENFORTS GAINÉS POUR PNEUMATIQUES | [2023/26] |
Former [2020/43] | GUIDE-FIL POUR LA FABRICATION D'ELEMENTS DE RENFORT GAINES POUR PNEUMATIQUES | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/43] | 25.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.11.2023 | CZ | 15.11.2023 | DK | 15.11.2023 | EE | 15.11.2023 | ES | 15.11.2023 | HR | 15.11.2023 | IT | 15.11.2023 | LT | 15.11.2023 | LV | 15.11.2023 | MC | 15.11.2023 | NL | 15.11.2023 | PL | 15.11.2023 | RO | 15.11.2023 | RS | 15.11.2023 | SE | 15.11.2023 | SK | 15.11.2023 | SM | 15.11.2023 | LU | 14.12.2023 | BG | 15.02.2024 | NO | 15.02.2024 | GR | 16.02.2024 | IS | 15.03.2024 | PT | 15.03.2024 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
CZ | 15.11.2023 | ||
DK | 15.11.2023 | ||
EE | 15.11.2023 | ||
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
IT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RO | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
SK | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
CZ | 15.11.2023 | ||
DK | 15.11.2023 | ||
EE | 15.11.2023 | ||
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RO | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
DK | 15.11.2023 | ||
EE | 15.11.2023 | ||
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
DK | 15.11.2023 | ||
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 15.11.2023 | |
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 16.02.2024 | |
IS | 15.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [IY]US3240233 (JOHNSTON ARCHIBALD P) [I] 1-3,6,7,10,11,15 * column 1, line 35 - line 72 * * column 3, line 8 - line 44 * * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 5 * * column 4, line 32 - line 47 * * figures 1,4,5 * [Y] 4,5,8,9,12-14; | [I]FR2400399 (HERRY PAUL [FR]) [I] 1-3,6,7,10,11,15 * page 1, line 29 - page 2, line 21 * * page 3, line 26 - page 4, line 13 ** figures 1,2 *; | [Y]WO2017198559 (MICHELIN & CIE [FR]) [Y] 4,5,8,9,12-14 * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0134] * * figures 6,8 * | by applicant | WO2010105975 | WO2010136389 | WO2011012521 | WO2011051204 | WO2012016757 | WO2012038340 | WO2012038341 | WO2012069346 | WO2012104279 | WO2012104280 | WO2012104281 | WO2015014776 |