EP3725003 - DUAL DETECTOR WITH TRANSVERSE COILS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Manneschi, Alessandro 15 Via XXV Aprile 52100 Arezzo / IT | [2020/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2020/43] | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2020/43] | Application number, filing date | 18815247.4 | 14.12.2018 | [2020/43] | WO2018EP85038 | Priority number, date | FR20170062289 | 15.12.2017 Original published format: FR 1762289 | [2020/43] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019115798 | Date: | 20.06.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3725003 | Date: | 21.10.2020 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3725003 | Date: | 05.04.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04B5/00, G01V3/10, G01V3/12, G01V3/16 | [2022/48] | CPC: |
H04B5/73 (EP,KR,US);
H04B5/00 (RU);
G01V3/10 (EP,KR);
G01V3/105 (EP,US);
G01S13/878 (US);
G01S13/885 (US);
G01S13/887 (US);
G01V3/12 (EP,KR);
G01V3/15 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2020/43] | H04B5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DOPPELDETEKTOR MIT QUERSPULEN | [2020/43] | English: | DUAL DETECTOR WITH TRANSVERSE COILS | [2020/43] | French: | DÉTECTEUR DOUBLE TECHNOLOGIE À BOBINES TRANSVERSES | [2020/43] | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/43] | 10.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 05.04.2023 | CZ | 05.04.2023 | EE | 05.04.2023 | HR | 05.04.2023 | LT | 05.04.2023 | LV | 05.04.2023 | MC | 05.04.2023 | PL | 05.04.2023 | RO | 05.04.2023 | RS | 05.04.2023 | SI | 05.04.2023 | SK | 05.04.2023 | SM | 05.04.2023 | NO | 05.07.2023 | GR | 06.07.2023 | IS | 05.08.2023 | PT | 07.08.2023 | LU | 14.12.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/24] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
CZ | 05.04.2023 | ||
EE | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RO | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SI | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
CZ | 05.04.2023 | ||
EE | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RO | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 05.04.2023 | |
EE | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RO | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | HR | 05.04.2023 | |
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | HR | 05.04.2023 | |
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 05.04.2023 | |
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | PL | 05.04.2023 | |
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | NO | 05.07.2023 | |
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | PT | 07.08.2023 | Cited in | International search | [IA]US3758849 (SUSMAN L, et al); | [A]WO2012024133 (NIITEK INC [US], et al); | [A]US9733353 (CARLSON DOUGLAS O [US], et al) | by applicant | US3758849 | WO2012024133 | US9733353 |