EP3714439 - DIRECTING USER ATTENTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.07.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.05.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Google LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2020/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PALOS, Xavier Benavides GOOGLE LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View California 94043 / US | 02 /
BARROS, Brett GOOGLE LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View California 94043 / US | 03 /
BECHARD, Paul GOOGLE LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View California 94043 / US | [2020/40] | Representative(s) | Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | [2020/40] | Application number, filing date | 18815446.2 | 19.11.2018 | [2020/40] | WO2018US61762 | Priority number, date | US201762588739P | 20.11.2017 Original published format: US 201762588739 P | [2020/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019099979 | Date: | 23.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3714439 | Date: | 30.09.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06T19/00, G06T19/20 | [2020/40] | CPC: |
G06T19/006 (EP,US);
G06T15/80 (US);
G06T17/20 (US);
G06T19/20 (EP);
G06T7/70 (US);
G06T2219/2012 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/40] | Title | German: | LENKUNG DER BENUTZERAUFMERKUNG | [2020/40] | English: | DIRECTING USER ATTENTION | [2020/40] | French: | DIRECTION DE L'ATTENTION DE L'UTILISATEUR | [2020/40] | Entry into regional phase | 13.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 13.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/40] | 13.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI] - NewscastStudio, "Augmented reality presents storytelling opportunities in weather", (20170725), pages 1 - 7, URL: https://www.newscaststudio.com/2017/07/25/augmented-reality-weather/2/, (20190117), XP002788066 [X] 1,17,21,33,43 * page 1 - page 2 * [I] 2-7,18-20,22-32,34-42,44-46 | [XI] - CHASTINE J ET AL, "Studies on the Effectiveness of Virtual Pointers in Collaborative Augmented Reality", 3D USER INTERFACES, 2008 IEEE SYMPOSIUM ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20080308), ISBN 978-1-4244-2047-6, pages 117 - 124, XP031339891 [X] 8 * figure 1 * [I] 9-16 | [A] - HOSHANG KOLIVAND ET AL, "Realistic Real-Time Outdoor Rendering in Augmented Reality", PLOS ONE, (20140930), vol. 9, no. 9, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0108334, page e108334, XP055543772 [A] 1-46 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0108334 |