EP3724532 - DISC BRAKE FOR A UTILITY VEHICLE, AND BRAKE PAD SET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.06.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.07.2021 [2021/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Nutzfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Str. 80 80809 München / DE | [2020/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PETSCHKE, Andreas Am Schlosspark 17 94127 Neuburg am Inn / DE | 02 /
HIDRINGER, Michael Neuderting 1 94544 Hofkirchen / DE | 03 /
PLEINTINGER, Martin Salzberg 1 94428 Eichendorf / DE | 04 /
SCHROPP, Josef Pitzling 108 94428 Eichendorf / DE | 05 /
FISCHL, Tobias Kobellstr. 2b 80336 München / DE | [2020/43] | Application number, filing date | 18815609.5 | 04.12.2018 | [2020/43] | WO2018EP83446 | Priority number, date | DE201710129672 | 12.12.2017 Original published format: DE102017129672 | [2020/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019115286 | Date: | 20.06.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3724532 | Date: | 21.10.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F16D55/226, F16D65/097 | [2020/43] | CPC: |
F16D55/226 (EP);
B60T1/065 (US);
F16D55/2262 (US);
F16D65/0056 (US);
F16D65/02 (EP);
F16D65/097 (EP);
F16D65/0971 (US);
F16D2055/0008 (US);
F16D2055/0029 (EP);
F16D2127/02 (US);
F16D65/0977 (EP);
F16D65/0978 (EP);
F16D65/0979 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/43] | Title | German: | SCHEIBENBREMSE FÜR EIN NUTZFAHRZEUG UND BREMSBELAGSATZ | [2020/43] | English: | DISC BRAKE FOR A UTILITY VEHICLE, AND BRAKE PAD SET | [2020/43] | French: | FREIN À DISQUE POUR VÉHICULE UTILITAIRE ET JEU DE GARNITURES DE FREIN | [2020/43] | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/43] | 13.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/28] | 02.02.2021 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 23.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2021/28] | 23.02.2021 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2012222925 (KANEKO SHINOBU [JP]) [X] 1-3,25 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0031]; figure - * [I] 4-6; | [XPA]WO2018054825 (KNORR BREMSE SYSTEME FUER NUTZFAHRZEUGE GMBH [DE]) [XP] 1,7,26 * page 22, line 20 - page 23, line 5; figure 6 * [A] 8-10; | [XP]WO2018077728 (KNORR BREMSE SYSTEME FUER NUTZFAHRZEUGE GMBH [DE]) [XP] 1,11-14,27 * page 22, line 13 - line 30; figure 13 *; | [XI]DE19623867 (KNORR BREMSE SYSTEME [DE]) [X] 1,15,28 * column 3, line 40 - column 5, line 31; figure - * [I] 16-19; | [X]JP2010281370 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1,20-24,29 * paragraph [0160]; figures 25-2 * | by applicant | DE102007001213 | DE102012006111 | DE4301621 | US2014339026 |