Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3759038 | Global Dossier | 22.02.2023 | B1 | EP3759038 | 06.01.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102018001569 | 28.02.2018 | WO2018EP83607 | 05.12.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019166117 | Global Dossier | 06.09.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102018001569 | 28.02.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102018001569 | 31.10.2019 | B4 | DE102018001569 | 29.08.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102018001569 | 28.02.2018 |