EP3544643 - BONE SUBSTITUTE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 11.10.2023 [2023/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Geistlich Pharma AG Bahnhofstrasse 40 6110 Wolhusen / CH | [2019/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZIHLMANN, Claudio Bundesplatz 2 6003 Luzern / CH | 02 /
BUFLER, Michael Hinterlindenweg 73 4153 Reinach / CH | [2019/40] | Representative(s) | Savatier, Yves Geistlich Pharma AG Bahnhofstrasse 40 6110 Wolhusen / CH | [2019/40] | Application number, filing date | 18816063.4 | 13.12.2018 | [2019/40] | WO2018EP84783 | Priority number, date | EP20170207235 | 14.12.2017 Original published format: EP 17207235 | [2019/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019115704 | Date: | 20.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3544643 | Date: | 02.10.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3544643 | Date: | 13.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/12, A61L27/32, A61L27/58 | [2019/40] | CPC: |
A61L27/12 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61F2/28 (IL,KR);
A61L24/0063 (IL,US);
A61L27/32 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61L27/425 (IL,KR,US);
A61L27/46 (IL,US);
A61L27/56 (IL,US);
A61L27/58 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B33Y80/00 (IL,US);
A61F2002/2835 (IL,KR);
A61F2310/00293 (IL,KR);
A61L2400/12 (EP,IL,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KNOCHENERSATZMATERIAL | [2019/40] | English: | BONE SUBSTITUTE MATERIAL | [2019/40] | French: | MATÉRIAU DE SUBSTITUT OSSEUX | [2020/08] |
Former [2019/40] | MATÉRIAU DE SUBSTITUTION OSSEUSE | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/40] | 28.06.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/16] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 13.05.2020 | CY | 13.05.2020 | EE | 13.05.2020 | FI | 13.05.2020 | HR | 13.05.2020 | LT | 13.05.2020 | LV | 13.05.2020 | MC | 13.05.2020 | MK | 13.05.2020 | MT | 13.05.2020 | RO | 13.05.2020 | RS | 13.05.2020 | SI | 13.05.2020 | SK | 13.05.2020 | SM | 13.05.2020 | BG | 13.08.2020 | GR | 14.08.2020 | IS | 13.09.2020 | LU | 13.12.2020 | [2023/41] |
Former [2022/33] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
CY | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
MK | 13.05.2020 | ||
MT | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
LU | 13.12.2020 | ||
Former [2022/28] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
CY | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
MT | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
LU | 13.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
LU | 13.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 13.05.2020 | |
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 13.05.2020 | |
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 13.05.2020 | |
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 13.05.2020 | |
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 13.05.2020 | |
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 13.09.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2010149296 (GEISTLICH PHARMA AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A] - BORUM-NICHOLAS L ET AL, "Surface modification of hydroxyapatite. Part I. Dodecyl alcohol", BIOMATERI, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV., BARKING, GB, (20030901), vol. 24, no. 21, doi:10.1016/S0142-9612(03)00239-4, ISSN 0142-9612, pages 3671 - 3679, XP004431146 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0142-9612(03)00239-4 | by applicant | EP0285826 | US5167961 | WO9741273 | US6338752 | US2013045360 | EP2445543 | WO2015009154 | - MATHEW M. et al., Acta. Cryst., (19770000), vol. 33, page 1325 | - DICKENS B. et al., J. Solid State Chemistry, (19740000), vol. 10, page 232 | - DURUCAN C. et al., J. Mat. Sci., (20020000), vol. 37, page 963 | - LANDERS R. et al., Biomaterials, (20020000), vol. 23, no. 23, page 4437 | - YEONG W.-Y. et al., Trends in Biotechnology, (20040000), vol. 22, no. 12, page 643 | - SEITZ H. et al., Biomed. Mater. Res., (20050000), vol. 74B, no. 2, page 782 | - POMMERSHEIM, J.C.; CLIFTON, J.R., Cem. Conc. Res., (19790000), vol. 9, page 765 | - POMMERSHEIM, J.C.; CLIFTON, J.R., Cem. Conc. Res., (19820000), vol. 12, page 765 | - MATHEW M. et al., Acta. Cryst., (19770000), vol. B33, page 1325 | - YEONG W.-Y. et al., Biotechnology, (20040000), vol. 22, no. 12, page 643 | - R.A. GITTENS et al., Biomaterials, (20110500), vol. 32, no. 13, pages 3395 - 3403 | - GREGG, S. J.; SING, K.S.W., Adsorption, Surface Area and Porosity, Academic Press Inc, (19820000), pages 173 - 190 |