EP3728280 - METHOD FOR IMPROVING THE ORAL BIOAVAILABILITY OF A DRUG [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.05.2023 | ||
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.12.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.10.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.05.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pharmacytics B.V. Transistorweg 5v 6534 AT Nijmegen / NL | [2020/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAC CORMICK, Somhairle Transistorweg 5v 6534 AT Nijmegen / NL | 02 /
VEENEMAN, Gerrit Herman Transistorweg 5v 6534 AT Nijmegen / NL | [2020/44] | Representative(s) | Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau B.V. P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | [2020/44] | Application number, filing date | 18816140.0 | 18.12.2018 | [2020/44] | WO2018EP85567 | Priority number, date | EP20170209734 | 21.12.2017 Original published format: EP 17209734 | [2020/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019121734 | Date: | 27.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3728280 | Date: | 28.10.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3728280 | Date: | 28.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07H15/18, C07H15/26, C07H19/06, C07H19/067, A61K31/7064, A61K31/7076, A61K31/7048, A61K31/7028 | [2020/44] | CPC: |
C07H15/26 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/549 (US);
A61K31/7042 (KR);
C07H15/18 (EP,US);
C07H19/06 (EP,KR);
C07H19/067 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/44] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER BIOVERFÜGBARKEIT EINES ARZNEIMITTELS | [2022/23] | English: | METHOD FOR IMPROVING THE ORAL BIOAVAILABILITY OF A DRUG | [2020/44] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR AMÉLIORER LA BIODISPONIBILITÉ D'UN MÉDICAMENT | [2022/23] |
Former [2020/44] | VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER ORALEN BIOVERFÜGBARKEIT EINES ARZNEIMITTELS | ||
Former [2020/44] | PROCÉDÉ D'AMÉLIORATION DE LA BIODISPONIBILITÉ ORALE D'UN MÉDICAMENT | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 14.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/44] | 14.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 02.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.04.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 28.06.2023 | ES | 28.06.2023 | HR | 28.06.2023 | RO | 28.06.2023 | RS | 28.06.2023 | SM | 28.06.2023 | GR | 25.08.2023 | IS | 24.09.2023 | NO | 28.09.2023 | [2024/10] |
Former [2024/09] | CZ | 28.06.2023 | |
ES | 28.06.2023 | ||
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | HR | 28.06.2023 | |
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 28.06.2023 | |
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | GR | 25.08.2023 | |
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | NO | 28.09.2023 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5955100 (BOSSLET KLAUS [DE], et al) [Y] 1-12 * Claims, in particular claims 1 and 7-16, and examples *; | [Y]EP2098533 (PHARMACHEMIE BV [NL]) [Y] 1-12 * claims and examples *; | [Y]US2012065152 (WHOMSLEY RHYS [GB], et al) [Y] 1-12* Claims and examples, in particular claim 1 and claim 9 second column second compound *; | [YD]US2012264702 (SHULL BRIAN [US], et al) [YD] 1-12 * Claims, in particular claims 1, 10 and 13, and examples * | by applicant | US5955100 | US2001041676 | WO03073988 | EP2098533 | US2012022012 | US2012065152 | US2012264702 | - HELLRIEGEL, E.T., Clin. Pharmacol. Ther., (19960000), vol. 60, pages 601 - 7 | - BENET, L.Z., AAPS J., (20110000), vol. 13, pages 519 - 47 | - FASINU, P., Biopharm Drug Disp., (20110000), vol. 32, pages 185 - 209 | - Biochim. Biophys. Acta, (19940000), vol. 1200, page 117 | - Bioorg. Med. Chem. Lett., (20070000), vol. 7, page 6335 | - Biochim. Biophys. Acta, (20050000), vol. 1722, page 218 | - J. Med. Chem., (19840000), vol. 27, page 261 | - Altern. Lab. Anim., (20010000), vol. 29, pages 649 - 668 | - Bioorg. Med. Chem. Lett., (20160000), vol. 26, page 3774 | - J. Chem. Soc., (20010000), vol. 1, page 3037 |