EP3640726 - SHUTTER BLADE OPENING AND CLOSING DEVICE AND IMAGING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.10.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.2022 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2021/30] |
Former [2020/17] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YONEDA, Masafumi c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 02 /
HAYASHI, Toshiro c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2020/17] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/17] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 18816969.2 | 25.04.2018 | [2020/17] | WO2018JP16869 | Priority number, date | JP20170117232 | 14.06.2017 Original published format: JP 2017117232 | [2020/17] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018230170 | Date: | 20.12.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3640726 | Date: | 22.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.12.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G03B9/08 | [2020/27] | CPC: |
G03B9/08 (EP);
G03B9/14 (US);
G03B9/06 (US);
G03B9/18 (US);
G03B9/24 (US)
|
Former IPC [2020/17] | G03B9/36, G03B9/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/17] | Title | German: | VERSCHLUSSLAMELLENÖFFNUNGS- UND -SCHLIESSVORRICHTUNG UND ABBILDUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2020/17] | English: | SHUTTER BLADE OPENING AND CLOSING DEVICE AND IMAGING DEVICE | [2020/17] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'OUVERTURE ET DE FERMETURE DE LAMELLE D'OBTURATEUR ET DISPOSITIF D'IMAGERIE | [2020/17] | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.2019 | Translation filed | 23.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.2019 | Search fee paid | 23.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/17] | 12.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.10.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2022 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]JPH02105123 (CANON KK) [X] 1-7,9,10,15 * the whole document * [A] 11-14 [Y] 8; | [Y]US4290682 (SAITO SYUICHIRO, et al) [Y] 8 * columns 2-3; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]US6443635 (MATSUMOTO JUNICHI [JP], et al) [Y] 8 * columns 7-10; figures 4,6 * | International search | [XY]JPH02105123 (CANON KK) [X] 1-5, 8- 9, 11, 20 * , * [Y] 6-7, 10, 12-19; | [Y]JPH05216090 (CANON KK) [Y] 6-7, 10, 12-19 * , [0013]-[0 * | by applicant | JPS6144191U | JPS62223735 |