EP3641251 - METHOD FOR MAPPING BETWEEN CODEWORD AND LAYER IN NEXT GENERATION COMMUNICATION SYSTEM AND APPARATUS THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.06.2022 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2020/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Hyungtae IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 02 /
KANG, Jiwon IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 03 /
PARK, Jonghyun IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 04 /
PARK, Haewook IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | [2020/17] | Representative(s) | Mooser, Sebastian Thomas Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/17] | Mooser, Sebastian Thomas Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18817768.7 | 12.06.2018 | [2020/17] | WO2018KR06630 | Priority number, date | US201762519794P | 14.06.2017 Original published format: US 201762519794 P | US201762524586P | 25.06.2017 Original published format: US 201762524586 P | US201762536438P | 24.07.2017 Original published format: US 201762536438 P | US201762557081P | 11.09.2017 Original published format: US 201762557081 P | [2020/17] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018230923 | Date: | 20.12.2018 | Language: | KO | [2018/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3641251 | Date: | 22.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 20.12.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/024, H04L5/00, H04B7/04 | [2021/10] | CPC: |
H04L5/0051 (EP,US);
H04B7/024 (EP);
H04B7/0626 (US);
H04B7/063 (EP);
H04L27/2613 (EP,US);
H04L5/0023 (EP,US);
H04L5/0048 (US);
H04L5/0094 (EP,US);
H04W72/0446 (US);
H04W72/23 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/17] | H04L25/03, H04L5/00, H04B7/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/17] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ZUORDNUNG ZWISCHEN CODEWORT UND SCHICHT IN EINEM KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM DER NÄCHSTEN GENERATION UND VORRICHTUNG DAFÜR | [2020/17] | English: | METHOD FOR MAPPING BETWEEN CODEWORD AND LAYER IN NEXT GENERATION COMMUNICATION SYSTEM AND APPARATUS THEREFOR | [2020/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE MAPPAGE ENTRE MOT DE CODE ET COUCHE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION DE PROCHAINE GÉNÉRATION, ET APPAREIL ASSOCIÉ | [2020/17] | Entry into regional phase | 07.11.2019 | Translation filed | 07.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 07.11.2019 | Search fee paid | 07.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/17] | 04.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/30] | 23.03.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - SAMSUNG, "Enhancements for non-coherent JT", vol. RAN WG1, no. Athens, Greece; 20170213 - 20170217, (20170212), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1702898 COMP NON-COHERENT JT, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20170212), XP051210042 [X] 1-10 * the whole document * | [XI] - INTEL CORPORATION, "Further enhancements to Coordinated Multi-Point (CoMP) Operation for LTE", vol. TSG RAN, no. West Palm Beach, USA; 20170605 - 20170608, (20170529), 3GPP DRAFT; RP-171030 RAN_76 SR FECOMP WI FOR LTE, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/TSG%5FRAN/TSGR%5F76/Docs/RP%2D171030%2Ezip, (20170529), XP051665449 [X] 1-3,5-8,10 * page 3 * [I] 4,9 | [A] - ZTE, "Remaining details on QCL assumptions for DM-RS", vol. RAN WG1, no. Hangzhou; 20170515 - 20170519, (20170514), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1707142 REMAINING DETAILS ON QCL ASSUMPTIONS FOR DMRS, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; F, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20170514), XP051272368 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2011026622 (LUO TAO [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * See paragraphs [0042]-[0092]; and figures 1-6. *; | [A]US2012300709 (SU XIN [CN], et al) [A] 1-10 * See paragraphs [0041]-[0105]; and figures 1, 4-13. *; | [Y]US2013070732 (NOH MIN SEOK [KR], et al) [Y] 1-10 * See paragraphs [0064], [0091], and claim 16. *; | [A]US2013265955 (KIM YOUNSUN [KR], et al) [A] 1-10* See paragraphs [0052]-[0097]; and figures 1-5. *; | [Y]US2015215908 (SEO INKWON [KR], et al) [Y] 1-10 * See paragraphs [0098], [0161]; claim 17; and figure 11. * |