EP3639152 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR PROCESSING TRADING INFORMATION FOR MULTIPLE APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.08.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.09.2021 [2021/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Axlware Technologies Private Limited No. 88 Borewell Road Opposite Whitefield Post Office Whitefield, Bangalore 560066 / IN | [2020/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAVISHANKAR, Krishnamurthy Flat 1 Charville Court Gayton Road Harrow London HA1 2HT / GB | 02 /
ARAVINTHAN, Krishnamurthi Flat 506 D Block Salarpuria Symphony apartments Hosur Main road Chikkatogur Gate Bangalore 560100 / IN | 03 /
PREMKUMAR, Jothimani 45 Bideford Rd Ruislip London HA4 0UE / GB | 04 /
RITESH, Belgudri 12 Ground Floor 2nd Main Vijayashree Layout Kodichikanhalli Bengaluru 560076 / IN | [2020/17] | Representative(s) | Wynne-Jones IP Limited Southgate House Southgate Street Gloucester, Gloucestershire GL1 1UB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/17] | Wynne-Jones IP Limited 2nd Floor, 5210 Valiant Court Gloucester Business Park Gloucester Gloucestershire GL3 4FE / GB | Application number, filing date | 18818121.8 | 12.06.2018 | [2020/17] | WO2018IN50386 | Priority number, date | IN201741020960 | 15.06.2017 Original published format: IN201741020960 | [2020/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018229795 | Date: | 20.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3639152 | Date: | 22.04.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.12.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IN | 20.12.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/16, G06Q40/00, G06Q40/06, G06Q40/04 | [2021/08] | CPC: |
G06Q40/04 (EP);
G06Q40/06 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/17] | G06F15/16, G06Q40/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/17] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR VERARBEITUNG VON HANDELSINFORMATIONEN FÜR MEHRERE ANWENDUNGEN | [2020/17] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR PROCESSING TRADING INFORMATION FOR MULTIPLE APPLICATIONS | [2020/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS COMMERCIALES POUR DE MULTIPLES APPLICATIONS | [2020/17] | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.2020 | Search fee paid | 15.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/17] | 27.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.08.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2021 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2008243675 (PARSONS SCOTT [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0041] * * paragraphs [0060] - [0073] * * paragraph [0108] - paragraph [0133] * * paragraph [0143] - paragraph [0157] * * figures 2,6 *; | [I]US2009299914 (MORAN JAMES P [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0066] * * figure 7 * | International search | [X]WO2006134373 (SOLARFLARE COMM INC [US], et al) [X] 1-5, 16-20 * description, claims (1, 21-24, 100) * |