EP3640884 - MANAGEMENT DEVICE, MANUFACTURING MANAGEMENT SYSTEM, MANAGEMENT METHOD, PROGRAM AND RECORDING MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.10.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.11.2021 [2021/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Spiber Inc. 234-1, Aza Mizukami Kakuganji Tsuruoka-shi Yamagata 997-0052 / JP | [2020/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEKIYAMA, Kazuhide c/o Spiber Inc. 234-1 Aza-Mizukami Kakuganji Tsuruoka-shi Yamagata 997-0052 / JP | 02 /
MEYER, Daniel c/o Spiber Inc. 234-1 Aza-Mizukami Kakuganji Tsuruoka-shi Yamagata 997-0052 / JP | 03 /
LIOBIS, Alex c/o Spiber Inc. 234-1 Aza-Mizukami Kakuganji Tsuruoka-shi Yamagata 997-0052 / JP | [2020/17] | Representative(s) | Plougmann Vingtoft a/s Strandvejen 70 2900 Hellerup / DK | [2020/17] | Application number, filing date | 18818863.5 | 11.06.2018 | [2020/17] | WO2018JP22145 | Priority number, date | JP20170115351 | 12.06.2017 Original published format: JP 2017115351 | [2020/17] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018230481 | Date: | 20.12.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3640884 | Date: | 22.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.12.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q50/04, G05B19/418, G06Q10/08, G06Q30/02 | [2020/51] | CPC: |
G06Q10/087 (EP);
A41H43/00 (US);
G05B15/02 (US);
G06Q30/0204 (EP);
G06Q50/04 (EP,US);
Y02P90/30 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/17] | G06Q50/04, G05B19/418 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/17] | Title | German: | VERWALTUNGSVORRICHTUNG, HERSTELLUNGSVERWALTUNGSSYSTEM, VERWALTUNGSVERFAHREN, PROGRAMM UND AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM | [2020/17] | English: | MANAGEMENT DEVICE, MANUFACTURING MANAGEMENT SYSTEM, MANAGEMENT METHOD, PROGRAM AND RECORDING MEDIUM | [2020/17] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE GESTION, SYSTÈME DE GESTION DE FABRICATION, PROCÉDÉ DE GESTION, PROGRAMME ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT | [2020/17] | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.2020 | Translation filed | 09.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.2020 | Search fee paid | 09.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/17] | 12.06.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/46] | 02.07.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2021 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [YA]JP2002240949 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [Y] 1-4, 10-14 * , paragraphs [0065]-[0070] (Family: none) * [A] 5-9; | [YA]JP2013186490 (TOSHIBA TEC KK) [Y] 1-4, 10-14 * , paragraph [0023] (Family: none) * [A] 5-9; | [YA]JP2004192106 (FUJITSU LTD) [Y] 1-4, 10-14 * , paragraphs [0061], [0062], fig. 8 (Family: none) * [A] 5-9; | [YA]JP2013154684 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [Y] 10-11 * , paragraph [0137] (Family: none) * [A] 5-9; | [YA]JP2005179792 (ENDO ISAO, et al) [Y] 11 * , paragraphs [0037]-[0039] (Family: none) * [A] 5-9; | [A]JP2009181491 (NEC CORP) [A] 1-14 * , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) * | by applicant | JP2001273021 |