EP3714168 - A FAN AND AN AIR CONDITIONING UNIT COMPRISING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Unitary effect registered Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for unitary effect filed Status updated on 24.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Decision on the request for unitary effect | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Proprietor(s) | For all participating member states ARTUS AIR LIMITED 8 Fitzroy Street London W1T 4BJ / GB | [2024/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOCKWOOD, Geoffrey Mark c/o emb-papst UK Ltd, Springfield Lyons Approach Chelmsford Business Park Chelmsford, Essex CM2 5EZ / GB | [2020/40] | Representative(s) | Dolleymores 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford, Hertfordshire WD18 0JU / GB | [2024/27] | Application number, filing date | 18819345.2 | 06.12.2018 | [2020/40] | WO2018GB53534 | Procedural language | EN | (Principal) place of business Tooltip on the date of filing | Principal place of businessTooltip | Unitary Patent Protection | 23.05.2024 | Date of request for unitary effect [2024/26] | 04.06.2024 | Decision on the request for unitary effect: Positive [2024/27] | 04.06.2024 | Date of registration [2024/27] | 01.05.2024 | Date of legal effect [2024/27] | Member States covered by Unitary Tooltip Patent Protection | 04.06.2024 | AT, BE, BG, DE, DK, EE, FI, FR, IT, LT, LU, LV, MT, NL, PT, SE, SI [2024/27] | Publication | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3714168 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/18] |