EP3723946 - METHOD FOR VALIDATING PROGRAMMED EXECUTION SEQUENCES OR TEACHING PROGRAMS FOR A ROBOT IN A WORKING CELL, AND ROBOT AND/OR ROBOT CONTROLLER FOR SAID METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wittmann Technology GmbH Lichtblaustr. 10 1220 Wien / AT | [2023/34] |
Former [2021/21] | For all designated states Wittmann Technology GmbH Lichtblaustr. 10 1220 Wien / AT | ||
Former [2020/43] | For all designated states Wittmann Kunststoffgeräte GmbH Lichtblaustrasse 10 1220 Wien / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WITTMANN, Peter Michael Berggasse 2 2100 Leobendorf / AT | [2020/43] | Representative(s) | Felfernig, Oliver, et al Reichsratsstraße 15 1010 Wien / AT | [2020/43] | Application number, filing date | 18819441.9 | 05.12.2018 | [2020/43] | WO2018AT60285 | Priority number, date | AT20170051032 | 14.12.2017 Original published format: AT 510322017 | [2020/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019113618 | Date: | 20.06.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3723946 | Date: | 21.10.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3723946 | Date: | 23.08.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B25J9/16 | [2020/43] | CPC: |
G05B19/4069 (EP);
B25J9/1671 (AT);
B25J9/163 (US);
B25J9/1692 (US);
B29C45/4225 (US);
G06F30/20 (US);
B29C2045/4283 (US);
G05B2219/35303 (EP);
G05B2219/35308 (EP);
G05B2219/40317 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VALIDIERUNG VON PROGRAMMIERTEN ABLAUFSEQUENZEN ODER TEACHPROGRAMMEN DES ROBOTERS IN EINER ARBEITSZELLE SOWIE EINEN ROBOTER UND/ODER ROBOTSTEUERUNG HIERFÜR | [2020/43] | English: | METHOD FOR VALIDATING PROGRAMMED EXECUTION SEQUENCES OR TEACHING PROGRAMS FOR A ROBOT IN A WORKING CELL, AND ROBOT AND/OR ROBOT CONTROLLER FOR SAID METHOD | [2020/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE VALIDATION DE SÉQUENCES DE DÉROULEMENT PROGRAMMÉES OU DE PROGRAMMES D'ENSEIGNEMENT D'UN ROBOT DANS UNE CELLULE DE TRAVAIL AINSI QUE ROBOT ET/OU COMMANDE DE ROBOT S'Y RAPPORTANT | [2020/43] | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/43] | 16.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 23.08.2023 | ES | 23.08.2023 | HR | 23.08.2023 | MC | 23.08.2023 | PL | 23.08.2023 | RO | 23.08.2023 | RS | 23.08.2023 | SK | 23.08.2023 | SM | 23.08.2023 | NO | 23.11.2023 | GR | 24.11.2023 | IS | 23.12.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 23.08.2023 | |
ES | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RO | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SK | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HR | 23.08.2023 | |
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 23.08.2023 | |
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 23.11.2023 | |
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 23.11.2023 | |
GR | 24.11.2023 | Cited in | International search | [I]US2015151431 (SUYAMA TAKASHI [JP], et al) [I] 1-14* paragraphs [0028] - [0042] - [0 60]; figures 1-3 *; | [XI]US2015379171 (KUWAHARA KOICHI [JP]) [X] 1,3,7,9,11-14 * paragraphs [0008] , [0 19] - [0031] - [0 59] , [ 128]; figures 1, 3, 5A-5D * [I] 2,4-6,8,10; | [I]US9811074 (AICHELE FABIAN [DE], et al) [I] 1-14 * figure 1 * * column 6, line 29 - column 7, line 46 * |