EP3643093 - HANDLING COMMUNICATION OF DATA IN A BLUETOOTH LOW ENERGY (BLE), MESH NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.09.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.08.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2021/40] |
Former [2020/18] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Jingcheng Bonäsvägen 7A 605 60 Svärtinge / SE | 02 /
RIMHAGEN, Thomas Glaspärlevägen 12 583 37 Linköping / SE | 03 /
SHEN, Wei Westmansgatan 74 582 16 Linköping / SE | 04 /
SKILLERMARK, Per Årstavägen 70 120 54 Årsta / SE | 05 /
ELMDAHL, Per Vifolkagatan 14 58247 Linköping / SE | 06 /
DI MARCO, Piergiuseppe Via Della Monica 16 64100 Teramo / IT | [2020/18] | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/40] | Zacco Sweden AB Valhallavägen 117 Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2020/18] | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 18819860.0 | 07.06.2018 | [2020/18] | WO2018SE50594 | Priority number, date | US201762523270P | 22.06.2017 Original published format: US 201762523270 P | [2020/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018236265 | Date: | 27.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3643093 | Date: | 29.04.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3643093 | Date: | 06.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 27.12.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/80, H04W84/18 | [2021/31] | CPC: |
H04W4/80 (EP,US);
H04L67/1042 (US);
H04W40/10 (US);
H04W40/12 (US);
H04W8/005 (US);
H04W84/18 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2020/18] | H04W4/80, H04W84/18, H04W40/24, H04W40/08, H04W40/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HANDHABUNG DER KOMMUNIKATION VON DATEN IN EINEM BLUETOOTH-NIEDERENERGIE(BLE)-MESH-NETZWERK | [2020/18] | English: | HANDLING COMMUNICATION OF DATA IN A BLUETOOTH LOW ENERGY (BLE), MESH NETWORK | [2020/18] | French: | GESTION DE COMMUNICATION DE DONNÉES DANS UN RÉSEAU MAILLÉ À FAIBLE ÉNERGIE BLUETOOTH (BLE) | [2020/18] | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 20.01.2020 | Search fee paid | 20.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/18] | 30.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.08.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.06.2018 | AL | 06.10.2021 | AT | 06.10.2021 | CY | 06.10.2021 | CZ | 06.10.2021 | DK | 06.10.2021 | EE | 06.10.2021 | ES | 06.10.2021 | FI | 06.10.2021 | HR | 06.10.2021 | IT | 06.10.2021 | LT | 06.10.2021 | LV | 06.10.2021 | MC | 06.10.2021 | MK | 06.10.2021 | MT | 06.10.2021 | PL | 06.10.2021 | RO | 06.10.2021 | RS | 06.10.2021 | SE | 06.10.2021 | SI | 06.10.2021 | SK | 06.10.2021 | SM | 06.10.2021 | BG | 06.01.2022 | NO | 06.01.2022 | GR | 07.01.2022 | IS | 06.02.2022 | PT | 07.02.2022 | IE | 07.06.2022 | LU | 07.06.2022 | BE | 30.06.2022 | CH | 30.06.2022 | FR | 30.06.2022 | LI | 30.06.2022 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/24] | HU | 07.06.2018 | |
AL | 06.10.2021 | ||
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CY | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
IT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
MK | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
IE | 07.06.2022 | ||
LU | 07.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
FR | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AL | 06.10.2021 | |
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CY | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
IT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
MK | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
IE | 07.06.2022 | ||
LU | 07.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
FR | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 06.10.2021 | |
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CY | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
IT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
IE | 07.06.2022 | ||
LU | 07.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
FR | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 06.10.2021 | |
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
IT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
IE | 07.06.2022 | ||
LU | 07.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
FR | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 06.10.2021 | |
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
IE | 07.06.2022 | ||
LU | 07.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
FR | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 06.10.2021 | |
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
IE | 07.06.2022 | ||
LU | 07.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 06.10.2021 | |
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
IE | 07.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 06.10.2021 | |
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 06.10.2021 | |
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 06.10.2021 | |
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 06.01.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2017135021 (KO LI-CHUN [TW], et al) [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0007] * * paragraphs [0028] - [0034] ** paragraphs [0048] - [0051] * | International search | [A]WO2014127104 (DAHRWIN LLC [US]) [A] 1-19 * ; abstract; [0059],[00102],[00129],[00145] *; | [A]EP3079387 (NXP BV [NL]) [A] 1-19 * ; abstract; [0016],[0046],[0049] *; | [A]WO2016191258 (NOKIA TECHNOLOGIES OY [FI], et al) [A] 1-19 * ; abstract; page 21, line 30 -page 22, line 9 *; | [X]US2016380778 (SHEN WEI [SE], et al) [X] 1-3, 6, 9-11, 14-, 17-19 * ; abstract; claims 23,33,43; [0007]-[0010],[0012],[0059],[0151 ]-[0152] *; | [A]US2017156102 (SINGH AJEET KUMAR [IN], et al) [A] 1-19 * ; abstract; claim 3; [0098],[0103] *; | [PA]US2018035247 (RAGHU ARVIND KANDHALU [US], et al) [PA] 1-19* ; abstract; [0032] * | Examination | CN101394357 | by applicant | CN101394357 | US2016380778 | US2017156102 |