10.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] |
03.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] |
12.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
28.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.08.2023 [2023/35] |
14.04.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.05.2023 [2023/20] |
03.02.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.03.2023 [2023/10] |
27.01.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.03.2023 [2023/09] |
20.01.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.02.2023 [2023/08] |
06.01.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.02.2023 [2023/06] |
30.12.2022 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 01.02.2023 [2023/05] |
02.12.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.01.2023 [2023/01] |
04.11.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.12.2022 [2022/49] |
28.10.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.11.2022 [2022/48] |
21.10.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.11.2022 [2022/47] |
14.10.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.11.2022 [2022/46] |
16.09.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.10.2022 [2022/42] |
26.08.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.09.2022 [2022/39] |
12.08.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.09.2022 [2022/37] |
05.08.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2022 [2022/36] |
29.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.08.2022 [2022/35] |
22.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] |
15.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] |
21.01.2022 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 23.02.2022 [2022/08] |
14.01.2022 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
14.01.2022 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
14.01.2022 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
04.11.2021 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
01.10.2021 |
Change - German title |
published on 03.11.2021 [2021/44] |
01.10.2021 |
Change - English title |
published on 03.11.2021 [2021/44] |
01.10.2021 |
Change - French title |
published on 03.11.2021 [2021/44] |
24.09.2021 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
14.07.2021 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
09.07.2021 |
First examination report |
|
21.05.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
21.04.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.11.2020 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 23.12.2020 [2020/52] |
20.11.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 23.12.2020 [2020/52] |
20.11.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 23.12.2020 [2020/52] |
27.03.2020 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 29.04.2020 [2020/18] |
27.03.2020 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 29.04.2020 [2020/18] |
16.03.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.01.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.01.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.12.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
21.12.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.01.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.12.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|