Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
10.09.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.10.2021 [2021/41] |
05.08.2021 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
27.05.2021 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
30.09.2020 | Supplementary search report | published on 28.10.2020 [2020/44] |
25.09.2020 | Change - classification | published on 28.10.2020 [2020/44] |
25.09.2020 | Change - classification | published on 28.10.2020 [2020/44] |
28.08.2020 | Change: Validation states | published on 30.09.2020 [2020/40] |
28.08.2020 | Change - extension states | published on 30.09.2020 [2020/40] |
24.06.2020 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
27.03.2020 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 29.04.2020 [2020/18] |
27.03.2020 | Request for examination filed | published on 29.04.2020 [2020/18] |
04.03.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
18.12.2019 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
16.12.2019 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
02.12.2019 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
15.11.2019 | Change - representative | |
15.11.2019 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
10.05.2019 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
15.01.2019 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
31.12.2018 | PCT data prior to European publication |