EP3643803 - HIGH-STRENGTH STEEL MEMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.09.2021 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.10.2021 [2021/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Steel Corporation 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1008071 / JP | [2020/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMASAKI, Shingo c/o NIPPON STEEL&SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION 6-1 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | 02 /
MANABE, Toshiyuki c/o NIPPON STEEL&SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION 6-1 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | [2020/18] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2020/18] | Application number, filing date | 18820105.7 | 22.06.2018 | [2020/18] | WO2018JP23905 | Priority number, date | JP20170123347 | 23.06.2017 Original published format: JP 2017123347 | [2020/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018235962 | Date: | 27.12.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3643803 | Date: | 29.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.12.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C22C38/00, C21D1/06, C22C38/38, C22C38/58, C21D8/06, C21D6/00, C22C38/02, C22C38/04, C22C38/06, C22C38/20, C22C38/22, C22C38/24, C22C38/26, C22C38/28, C22C38/32, C22C38/50 | [2020/44] | CPC: |
C21D6/002 (EP,US);
C22C38/58 (EP,KR);
C22C38/50 (EP,US);
C21D1/06 (EP,KR);
C21D6/005 (EP,US);
C21D6/008 (EP,US);
C21D8/06 (EP,KR);
C21D8/065 (EP,US);
C22C38/001 (EP,US);
C22C38/004 (EP,US);
C22C38/02 (EP,US);
C22C38/04 (EP,US);
C22C38/06 (EP,US);
C22C38/20 (EP,US);
C22C38/22 (EP,US);
C22C38/24 (EP,US);
C22C38/26 (EP,US);
C22C38/28 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/18] | C22C38/00, C21D1/06, C22C38/38, C22C38/58, C21D8/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/18] | Title | German: | HOCHFESTES STAHLELEMENT | [2020/18] | English: | HIGH-STRENGTH STEEL MEMBER | [2020/18] | French: | ÉLÉMENT EN ACIER HAUTEMENT RÉSISTANT | [2020/18] | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.2019 | Translation filed | 14.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.2019 | Search fee paid | 14.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/18] | 27.04.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/41] | 26.05.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2021 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6085692 (ADAMS KENNETH P [US]) [X] 1-5 * claims 1-8; tables 1, ex. 1-20 *; | [A]JP2015178673 (KOBE STEEL LTD) [A] 1-5 * abstract *; | [A]JP2014101565 (JFE BARS & SHAPES CORP) [A] 1-5 * abstract *; | [A]JP2002069572 (NIPPON STEEL CORP, et al) [A] 1-5 * abstract *; | [A]WO2011077904 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * abstract * | International search | [A]WO2011077904 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * , *; | [A]JP2015178673 (KOBE STEEL LTD) [A] 1-5 * , *; | [A]JPH11201168 (NIPPON SEIKO KK) [A] 1-5 * , [0022], [0032] ~ [0036], [0051] ~ [0054], & US 6095692 A, Claim 1, column 5, lines 25 to 42, column 7, line 1 to column 8, line 61, column 12, line 32 to column 13, line 38, TABLE 1, TABLE 3, FIG. 1 & GB 2333106 A *; | [A]JP2014101565 (JFE BARS & SHAPES CORP) [A] 1-5 * , *; | [A]JP2002069572 (NIPPON STEEL CORP, et al) [A] 1-5 * , * | by applicant | JPH03243745 | JP2000026934 | JP2006045670 | JP2001288539 | JP2017123347 |