EP3643385 - FILTRATION MEMBRANE MODULE AND FILTRATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.01.2022 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states M. Technique Co., Ltd. 2-16, Technostage 2-chome Izumi-shi, Osaka 594-1144 / JP | [2020/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ENOMURA Masakazu c/o M. Technique Co. Ltd. 2-16 Technostage 2-chome Izumi-shi Osaka 594-1144 / JP | 02 /
YOSHIZUMI Mai c/o M. Technique Co. Ltd. 2-16 Technostage 2-chome Izumi-shi Osaka 594-1144 / JP | [2020/18] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/18] | Carpmael, Robert Maurice Charles Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | Application number, filing date | 18820914.2 | 21.06.2018 | [2020/18] | WO2018JP23641 | Priority number, date | WO2017JP22919 | 21.06.2017 Original published format: PCT/JP2017/022919 | [2020/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018235901 | Date: | 27.12.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3643385 | Date: | 29.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.12.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B01D35/00, B01D63/08, B01D65/00, B01D63/06 | [2021/17] | CPC: |
B01D63/066 (EP,KR,US);
B01D65/02 (KR,US);
B01D63/065 (KR,US);
B01D63/062 (EP);
B01D63/063 (KR,US);
B01D63/067 (KR,US);
B01D65/08 (EP,KR,US);
B01D71/02 (KR);
B01D2313/08 (KR,US);
B01D2313/19 (KR,US);
B01D2315/10 (KR,US);
B01D2321/04 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2321/2016 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/18] | B01D35/00, B01D63/08, B01D65/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/18] | Title | German: | FILTRATIONSMEMBRANMODUL UND FILTRATIONSVERFAHREN | [2020/18] | English: | FILTRATION MEMBRANE MODULE AND FILTRATION METHOD | [2020/18] | French: | MODULE MEMBRANAIRE DE FILTRATION ET DISPOSITIF DE FILTRATION | [2020/18] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2019 | Translation filed | 18.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2019 | Search fee paid | 18.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/18] | 02.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3922220 (MIDDLEMAN STANLEY, et al) [A] 1-7* the whole document *; | [X]JPS62273008 (KUBOTA LTD) [X] 1-7 * abstract *; | [X]US5294339 (JORGENS KLAUS [DE]) [X] 1-7 * column 4, line 24 - line 68; figure 1 *; | [X]US6077436 (RAJNIK LAWRENCE S [US], et al) [X] 1,3 * column 10, line 45 - line 65; figures 14-15b *; | [A]EP2586520 (BKT CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2016024056 (TECHNOLOGIES AVANCEES ET MEMBRANES IND [FR]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]JPS4896460 [Y] 2-3, 6 * , *; | [A]JPS5249353U [A] 1-7* , *; | [A]JPS52133238U [A] 1-7 * , *; | [A]JPS53142383 (KOBE STEEL LTD) [A] 1-7 * , *; | [Y]JP2000015012 (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECH CORP, et al) [Y] 6 * , *; | [Y]JP2003183019 (CATALYSTS & CHEM IND CO) [Y] 6 * , *; | [Y]JP2015066495 (MITSUBISHI KAKOKI KK) [Y] 6 * , *; | [Y]JP2017064689 (SPG TECH CO LTD) [Y] 6 * , *; | [XYA]JP6129389B [X] 1 * , * [Y] 2-3, 6 [A] 4-5, 7 | by applicant | JPS5249353 | JPS52133238U | JPH1157355 | WO9956851 | JP2006263517 | JP2006263640 | JP2011016037 | WO2013147272 | JP2014184362 | JP6151469B | JP6144447B |