EP3644675 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETERMINING DOWNLINK CONTROL CHANNEL RESOURCE, USER EQUIPMENT AND BASE STATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.05.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.04.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.12.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Datang Mobile Communications Equipment Co., Ltd. 1/F, Building 1, No. 5 Shangdi East Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2021/33] |
Former [2020/18] | For all designated states China Academy of Telecommunications Technology No. 40 Xue Yuan Road Hai Dian District Beijing 100191 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Lei No.40 Xueyuan Rd. Haidian District Beijing 100191 / CN | 02 /
CHENG, Fangchen No.40 Xueyuan Rd. Haidian District Beijing 100191 / CN | [2020/18] | Representative(s) | Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2020/18] | Application number, filing date | 18821235.1 | 15.06.2018 | [2020/18] | WO2018CN91548 | Priority number, date | CN201710464486 | 19.06.2017 Original published format: CN201710464486 | [2020/18] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018233566 | Date: | 27.12.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3644675 | Date: | 29.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3644675 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 27.12.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04, H04W74/08, H04W72/12 | [2022/02] | CPC: |
H04W74/0833 (EP,US);
H04W72/23 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04W48/12 (KR);
H04W74/006 (KR);
H04W74/0866 (KR);
H04W76/27 (US)
|
Former IPC [2020/22] | H04W72/04, H04W72/12, H04W74/00, H04W74/08 | ||
Former IPC [2020/18] | H04W72/04, H04W72/12, H04W74/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINER DOWNLINK-STEUERKANALRESSOURCE, BENUTZERAUSRÜSTUNG UND BASISSTATION | [2020/18] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETERMINING DOWNLINK CONTROL CHANNEL RESOURCE, USER EQUIPMENT AND BASE STATION | [2020/18] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE DÉTERMINER UNE RESSOURCE DE CANAL DE COMMANDE DE LIAISON DESCENDANTE, ÉQUIPEMENT UTILISATEUR ET STATION DE BASE | [2020/18] | Entry into regional phase | 27.12.2019 | Translation filed | 27.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 27.12.2019 | Search fee paid | 27.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/18] | 13.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.04.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 19.05.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.09.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 26.10.2022 | AT | 26.10.2022 | CZ | 26.10.2022 | DK | 26.10.2022 | EE | 26.10.2022 | ES | 26.10.2022 | FI | 26.10.2022 | HR | 26.10.2022 | IT | 26.10.2022 | LT | 26.10.2022 | LV | 26.10.2022 | MC | 26.10.2022 | NL | 26.10.2022 | PL | 26.10.2022 | RO | 26.10.2022 | RS | 26.10.2022 | SE | 26.10.2022 | SI | 26.10.2022 | SK | 26.10.2022 | SM | 26.10.2022 | NO | 26.01.2023 | GR | 27.01.2023 | IS | 26.02.2023 | PT | 27.02.2023 | IE | 15.06.2023 | LU | 15.06.2023 | BE | 30.06.2023 | CH | 30.06.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/24] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
MC | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SI | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
IE | 15.06.2023 | ||
LU | 15.06.2023 | ||
BE | 30.06.2023 | ||
CH | 30.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
MC | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SI | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
IE | 15.06.2023 | ||
LU | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/15] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
MC | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SI | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
LU | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
MC | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SI | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SI | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 26.10.2022 | |
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/17] | NL | 26.10.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY] - CATT, "Flexible reuse of DL control resources for data transmission", vol. RAN WG1, no. Hangzhou; 20170515 - 20170519, (20170506), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1707498, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_89/Docs/, (20170506), XP051261846 [X] 1-4,9-11,14,15 * figures 1-4 * * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 2, paragraph 2 - page 3 * [Y] 5-8,12,13 | [XA] - HUAWEI ET AL, "Design of control resource set", vol. RAN WG1, no. Spokane, USA; 20170116 - 20170120, (20170116), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1700014, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20170116), XP051207556 [X] 1-3,9,14,15 * page 1, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * * page 2, paragraph 2.2 - page 3 * * page 4, paragraph 3 * [A] 4-8,10-13 | [XA] - ZTE ET AL, "NR DL Control Channel Structure", vol. RAN WG1, no. Athens, Greece; 20170213 - 20170217, (20170212), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1701585 NR DL CONTROL CHANNEL STRUCTURE, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20170212), XP051208752 [X] 1-3,9,14,15 * figures 1, 2 * * page 1, paragraph 2 * * page 2, paragraph 3 - page 6 * * page 7, paragraph 4 * [A] 4-8,10-13 | [YA] - CATT, "Configuration aspects of the NR-PDCCH", vol. RAN WG1, no. Hangzhou; 20170515 - 20170519, (20170514), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1707497, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20170514), XP051272705 [Y] 5,7,8,12 * page 1, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2.1 * * page 2, paragraph 2.2 - page 3 * [A] 1-4,6,9-11,13-15 | [YA] - LG ELECTRONICS, "Discussion on CORESET configuration", vol. RAN WG1, no. Qingdao, P.R. China; 20170627 - 20170630, (20170617), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1710305, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_AH/NR_AH_1706/Docs/, (20170617), XP051304936 [Y] 6,13 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 2, paragraph 2.1 - page 6, paragraph 2.4 * [A] 1-5,7-12,14,15 | International search | US2013272259 [a] (KIM SOYEON [KR], et al) [a] 1-40* the whole document *; | [xX] - CATT, "Flexible reuse of DL control resources for data transmission", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG1 meeting #89, Hangzhou, China, (20170506), no. R1-1707498, XP051261846 [x] 1,2,5-11,14-20,23-31,34-40 | [pxPX] - CATT, "Flexible reuse of DL control resources for data transmission", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG1 meeting #90, Prague, Czechia, (20170820), no. R1-1712395, XP051315211 [px] 1,2,5-11,14-20,23-31,34-40 | Examination | - INTEL CORPORATION, "4-step PRACH procedures", vol. RAN WG1, no. Qingdao, P.R. China; 20170627 - 20170630, (20170617), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1710513 4 STEP PRACH PROCEDURES, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_AH/NR_AH_1706/Docs/, (20170617), XP051305084 |