EP3641762 - N/O-LINKED DEGRONS AND DEGRONIMERS FOR PROTEIN DEGRADATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.01.2023 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C4 Therapeutics, Inc. 490 Arsenal Way, Suite 200 Watertown, MA 02472 / US | [2020/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PHILLIPS, Andrew, J. C/o C4 Therapeutics Inc. 490 Arsenal Way Suite 200 Watertown MA 02472 / US | 02 /
NASVESCHUK, Christoper, G. C/o C4 Therapeutics Inc. 490 Arsenal Way Suite 200 Watertown MA 02472 / US | 03 /
HENDERSON, James, A. C/o C4 Therapeutics Inc. 490 Arsenal Way Suite 200 Watertown MA 02472 / US | 04 /
LIANG, Yanke C/o C4 Therapeutics Inc. 490 Arsenal Way Suite 200 Watertown MA 02472 / US | 05 /
HE, Minsheng C/o C4 Therapeutics Inc. 490 Arsenal Way Suite 200 Watertown MA 02472 / US | 06 /
DUPLESSIS, Martin C/o C4 Therapeutics Inc. 490 Arsenal Way Suite 200 Watertown MA 02472 / US | 07 /
CHEN, Chi-Li C/o C4 Therapeutics Inc. 490 Arsenal Way Suite 200 Watertown MA 02472 / US | [2020/18] | Representative(s) | Bassil, Nicholas Charles, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2020/18] | Application number, filing date | 18821251.8 | 20.06.2018 | [2020/18] | WO2018US38534 | Priority number, date | US201762522541P | 20.06.2017 Original published format: US 201762522541 P | [2020/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018237026 | Date: | 27.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3641762 | Date: | 29.04.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.12.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/426, A61K31/427, A61K45/06 | [2020/18] | CPC: |
A61K45/06 (EP);
C07D495/14 (US);
C07D207/456 (EP,US);
C07D211/42 (EP);
C07D211/56 (EP);
C07D211/88 (US);
C07D401/12 (EP,US);
C07D401/14 (EP,US);
C07D403/04 (US);
C07D405/12 (EP,US);
C07D413/12 (EP,US);
C07D471/04 (EP,US);
C07D487/04 (EP,US);
C07D495/04 (EP);
G07F17/3211 (US);
G07F17/3225 (US);
G07F17/3244 (US);
G07F17/3246 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/18] | Title | German: | N/O-GEBUNDENE DEGRONE UND DEGRONIMERE ZUM PROTEINABBAU | [2020/18] | English: | N/O-LINKED DEGRONS AND DEGRONIMERS FOR PROTEIN DEGRADATION | [2020/18] | French: | DÉGRONS ET DÉGRONIMÈRES À LIAISON N/O POUR LA DÉGRADATION DE PROTÉINES | [2020/18] | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.2020 | Search fee paid | 08.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/18] | 06.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US2016058872 (CREW ANDREW P [US], et al); | International search | [XA]WO2006135383 (MYRIAD GENETICS INC [US], et al); | [X]WO2007065948 (SOLVAY PHARM GMBH [DE], et al); | [X]WO2008079909 (PLEXXIKON INC [US], et al); | [X]WO2011017561 (BIOGEN IDEC INC [US], et al); | [A]WO2017024318 (DANA FARBER CANCER INST INC [US]); | [PA]WO2017197051 (C4 THERAPEUTICS INC [US]); |