EP3641757 - COMPOSITION, USES, AND METHODS OF TREATING SPINAL DISC DEGENERATION THROUGH SONIC HEDGEHOG SIGNALING PATHWAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states New York Society for the Relief of the Ruptured and Crippled, maintaining the Hospital for Special Surgery 535 East 70th Street New York, NY 10021 / US | [2023/27] |
Former [2020/18] | For all designated states New York Society for the Ruptured and Crippled Maintaining the Hospital for Special Surgery 535 East 70th Street New York, NY 10021 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAHIA, Chitra 535 East 70th Street New York NY 10021 / US | [2020/18] | Representative(s) | Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road Holborn London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/18] | Cornish, Kristina Victoria Joy, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | Application number, filing date | 18821602.2 | 23.06.2018 | [2020/18] | WO2018US39178 | Priority number, date | US201762524121P | 23.06.2017 Original published format: US 201762524121 P | US201862631184P | 15.02.2018 Original published format: US 201862631184 P | [2020/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018237368 | Date: | 27.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3641757 | Date: | 29.04.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.12.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/395, A61K31/416, A61K31/4166, A61K31/4535, A61K31/5377, A61K31/573 | [2021/12] | CPC: |
A61K31/4436 (EP,US);
A61K31/381 (EP);
A61K31/4535 (EP);
A61K31/5377 (EP);
A61K31/573 (EP);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P21/00 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/18] | A61K31/395, A61K31/416, A61K31/4166 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/18] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG, VERWENDUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON BANDSCHEIBENDEGENERATION DURCH EINEN HEDGEHOG-SCHALLSIGNALWEG | [2020/18] | English: | COMPOSITION, USES, AND METHODS OF TREATING SPINAL DISC DEGENERATION THROUGH SONIC HEDGEHOG SIGNALING PATHWAY | [2020/18] | French: | COMPOSITION, UTILISATIONS ET MÉTHODES DE TRAITEMENT DE LA DÉGÉNÉRESCENCE DU DISQUE VERTÉBRAL PAR L'INTERMÉDIAIRE D'UNE VOIE DE SIGNALISATION SONIC HEDGEHOG | [2020/18] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2020 | Search fee paid | 21.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/18] | 20.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - DAHIA C ET AL, "In Vitro Model System to Study Mouse Intervertebral Disc Growth", THE SPINE JOURNAL, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 10, no. 9, ISSN 1529-9430, (20100901), page S138, (20100901), XP027272495 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - M. KYLE HADDEN, "Hedgehog Pathway Agonism: Therapeutic Potential and Small-Molecule Development", CHEMMEDCHEM, DE, (20131107), vol. 9, no. 1, doi:10.1002/cmdc.201300358, ISSN 1860-7179, pages 27 - 37, XP055628960 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cmdc.201300358 | International search | [A]US2004230309 (DIMAURO THOMAS M [US], et al) [A] 1-3, 29-31, 43-49 * Entire Document *; | [A]US2008138379 (JENNINGS-SPRING BARBARA L [US]) [A] 1-3, 29-31, 43-49 * Entire Document *; | [A]US2011172233 (PENG LEE F [US], et al) [A] 1-3, 29-31, 43-49* Entire Document *; | [A]US2014275025 (ANDERSKEWITZ RALF [DE], et al) [A] 1-3, 29-31, 43-49 * Entire Document *; | [YA]US2016143984 (CHEN GONG [US], et al) [Y] 2, 16, 30, 49 * Para [0033]; Para [0044]; Para [0056]; * [A] 17/16; | [YA]US2017065745 (BROWN LAURA J [US], et al) [Y] 1-2, 15-16, 29-30, 43-49 * Para [0003]; Para [0013];Para [0014]; Para [0015]; Para [0020]; Para [0048]; Para [0050]; Para [0095]; Para [0097]; * [A] 3, 17/15, 17/16, 31; | [YA] - DAHIA et al., "Shh Signaling from the Nucleus Pulposus Is Required for the Postnatal Growth and Differentiation of the Mouse Intervertebral Disc", PLoS One, (20120400), vol. 7, no. 4, pages 1 - 15, XP055555501 [Y] 1-2, 15-16, 29-30, 43-49 * Pg. 1, Abstract; Pg. 2, Col.2, Para [2]; Pg. 3, Col. 2, Para [1]; Pg. 8, Col. 1, Para [2]; Pg. 10, Col. 2, Para [1]; Pg. 11, Col. 1, Para [1]; * [A] 3, 17/15, 17/16, 31 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0035944 | [A] - RISBUD et al., "Notochordal Cells in the Adult Intervertebral Disc: New Perspective on an Old Question", Crit Rev Eukaryot Gene Expr., (20110000), vol. 21, no. 1, pages 29 - 41, XP055660976 [A] 3, 17/15, 17/16, 31 * Pg. 6, Para [1]; Pg. 6, Para [2]; * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1615/CritRevEukarGeneExpr.v21.i1.30 |