EP3720903 - THERMALLY TREATED POLYAMIC AMIDE AEROGEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.08.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Blueshift Materials, Inc. 5 South Spencer Road Spencer, MA 01562 / US | [2020/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAKAGUCHI, Alan, D. c/o Blueshift Materials, Inc. 5 South Spencer Road Spencer, MA 01562 / US | 02 /
POE, Garrett, D. c/o Blueshift Materials, Inc. 5 South Spencer Road Spencer, MA 01562 / US | 03 /
IRVIN, David, J. c/o Blueshift Materials, Inc. 5 South Spencer Road Spencer, MA 01562 / US | 04 /
JOAQUIN, Alysa, M. c/o Blueshift Materials, Inc. 5 South Spencer Road Spencer, MA 01562 / US | 05 /
MANNING, Janae, D. c/o Blueshift Materials, Inc. 5 South Spencer Road Spencer, MA 01562 / US | [2024/06] |
Former [2020/42] | 01 /
SAKAGUCHI, Alan, D. c/o Blueshift Materials, Inc. 5 South Spencer Road Spencer, Massachusetts 01562 / US | ||
02 /
POE, Garrett, D. c/o Blueshift Materials, Inc. 5 South Spencer Road Spencer, Massachusetts 01562 / US | |||
03 /
IRVIN, David, J. c/o Blueshift Materials, Inc. 5 South Spencer Road Spencer, Massachusetts 01562 / US | |||
04 /
JOAQUIN, Alysa, M. c/o Blueshift Materials, Inc. 5 South Spencer Road Spencer, Massachusetts 01562 / US | |||
05 /
MANNING, Janae, D. c/o Blueshift Materials, Inc. 5 South Spencer Road Spencer, Massachusetts 01562 / US | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstraße 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [2020/42] | Application number, filing date | 18821814.3 | 28.11.2018 | [2020/42] | WO2018US62833 | Priority number, date | US201762594786P | 05.12.2017 Original published format: US 201762594786 P | [2020/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019112855 | Date: | 13.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3720903 | Date: | 14.10.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3720903 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C08J9/28, B01J13/00, C08G73/10 | [2020/42] | CPC: |
C08J9/28 (EP,CN,US);
B01J13/0091 (EP,US);
C08G73/1017 (CN);
C08G73/1042 (CN);
C08G73/105 (EP,US);
C08G73/1071 (CN);
C08G73/10 (EP);
C08J2201/0482 (EP,US);
C08J2201/0502 (EP,US);
C08J2205/024 (EP,US);
C08J2205/026 (EP,CN,US);
C08J2205/042 (EP,US);
C08J2205/044 (EP,US);
C08J2205/05 (EP,US);
C08J2207/00 (EP);
C08J2379/08 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | THERMISCH BEHANDELTES POLYAMIDAEROGEL | [2020/42] | English: | THERMALLY TREATED POLYAMIC AMIDE AEROGEL | [2020/42] | French: | AÉROGEL D'AMIDE POLYAMIQUE TRAITÉ THERMIQUEMENT | [2020/42] | Entry into regional phase | 05.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 05.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/42] | 05.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 29.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.02.2024 | BG | 07.02.2024 | ES | 07.02.2024 | FI | 07.02.2024 | HR | 07.02.2024 | LT | 07.02.2024 | LV | 07.02.2024 | NL | 07.02.2024 | PL | 07.02.2024 | SE | 07.02.2024 | NO | 07.05.2024 | RS | 07.05.2024 | GR | 08.05.2024 | IS | 07.06.2024 | PT | 07.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 07.02.2024 | |
BG | 07.02.2024 | ||
ES | 07.02.2024 | ||
FI | 07.02.2024 | ||
HR | 07.02.2024 | ||
LT | 07.02.2024 | ||
LV | 07.02.2024 | ||
NL | 07.02.2024 | ||
PL | 07.02.2024 | ||
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
RS | 07.05.2024 | ||
GR | 08.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
PT | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 07.02.2024 | |
BG | 07.02.2024 | ||
ES | 07.02.2024 | ||
FI | 07.02.2024 | ||
HR | 07.02.2024 | ||
LT | 07.02.2024 | ||
NL | 07.02.2024 | ||
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
RS | 07.05.2024 | ||
GR | 08.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 07.02.2024 | |
FI | 07.02.2024 | ||
HR | 07.02.2024 | ||
LT | 07.02.2024 | ||
NL | 07.02.2024 | ||
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
RS | 07.05.2024 | ||
GR | 08.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 07.02.2024 | |
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 07.06.2024 | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US2014127494 (YAKUWA SHINPEI [JP], et al); | [Y]WO2017074751 (BLUESHIFT INT MAT INC [US]); | [XP]WO2017212424 (BLUESHIFT INTERNATIONAL MAT INC [US], et al) | by applicant | US9109088 | US9206298 |