EP3704161 - METHODS OF PRODUCING GLYCAN POLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.07.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.08.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.05.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kaleido Biosciences, Inc. 65 Hayden Avenue Lexington, MA 02421 / US | [2020/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GEREMIA, John M. 65 Hayden Avenue Lexington MA 02421 / US | 02 /
LIU, Christopher Matthew 65 Hayden Avenue Lexington MA 02421 / US | 03 /
MURPHY, Anastasia V. 65 Hayden Avenue Lexington MA 02421 / US | [2020/37] | Representative(s) | Bühler, Dirk Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/37] | Bühler, Dirk Maiwald Patentanwalts- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18822172.5 | 03.11.2018 | [2020/37] | WO2018US59101 | Priority number, date | US201762581571P | 03.11.2017 Original published format: US 201762581571 P | US201862720924P | 21.08.2018 Original published format: US 201862720924 P | [2020/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019090181 | Date: | 09.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3704161 | Date: | 09.09.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C08B37/00 | [2020/37] | CPC: |
C08B37/00 (EP);
C08B37/006 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/37] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON GLYCANPOLYMEREN | [2020/37] | English: | METHODS OF PRODUCING GLYCAN POLYMERS | [2020/37] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE PRODUCTION DE POLYMÈRES GLYCANES | [2020/37] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/37] | 25.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.03.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/32] | 29.03.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [IY]WO2016007778 (MIDORI USA INC [US]) [I] 1-49 * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0103] - paragraph [0248] * * paragraph [0249] - paragraph [0267] * * paragraph [0317] * [Y] 1-237; | [IY]WO2016122885 (MIDORI USA INC [US]) [I] 1-49 * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0189] - paragraph [0193] * * paragraph [0194] - paragraph [0208] * * paragraph [0223] - paragraph [0232] * * paragraph [0238] - paragraph [0335] * * paragraph [0336] - paragraph [0350] * * paragraph [0351] * [Y] 1-237; | [Y] - RUIQING XIAO ET AL, "Chemical synthesis of polysaccharides and polysaccharide mimetics", PROGRESS IN POLYMER SCIENCE., GB, (20171101), vol. 74, doi:10.1016/j.progpolymsci.2017.07.009, ISSN 0079-6700, pages 78 - 116, XP055554770 [Y] 1-237 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.progpolymsci.2017.07.009 | by applicant | US5085883 | WO2012118767 | WO2014031956 | US9079171 | WO2016007778 | WO2016122889 | WO2016122884 | WO2016122885 | WO2016172657 | WO2016172658 | US2016366909 | WO2017035412 | - ERGUN, R. et al., Moisture and Shelf Life in Sugar Confections, Critical Reviews in Food Science and Nutrition, (20100000), vol. 50, no. 2, pages 162 - 192 | - NIROOMAND, F. et al., "Fate of Bacterial Pathogens and Indicator Organisms in Liquid Sweeteners", Journal of Food Protection, (19980000), vol. 61, no. 3, pages 295 - 299 | - GIBSON G R; ROBERFROID M B, JNutr., (19950000), vol. 125, pages 1401 - 12 | - GOMEZ et al., J Agric Food Chem, (20140000), vol. 62, page 9769 | - HOLCK et al., JAgric Food Chem, (20110000), vol. 59, no. 12, pages 6511 - 6519 | - HAKOMORI, J. Biochem., (19640000), vol. 55, page 205 | - HARDING et al., Carbohydr. Res., (20050000), vol. 340, page 1107 | - MCCLEARY et al., J. AOAC Int., (20100000), vol. 93, no. 1, pages 221 - 233 | - MCCLEARY et al., J. AOAC Int., (20120000), vol. 95, no. 3, pages 824 - 844 | - "Fermentability of Various Fiber Sources by Human Fecal Bacteria In Vitro", AMERICAN JOURNAL CLINICAL NUTRITION, (19910000), vol. 53, pages 1418 - 1424 | - COLOWICK; KAPLAN, Methods In Enzymology, Academic Press | - ROSLUND et al., Carbohydrate Res., (20080000), vol. 343, pages 101 - 112 | - HEISS et al., Carbohydr. Res., (20090000), vol. 344, page 915 | - WITCZAK, Z. J. PROPERTIES, Glycoscience: Chemistry and Biology I-III, Springer-Verlag, (20010000), pages 1445 - 1464 | - ZAHRINGER, U. et al., Carbohydr. Res., (20130000), vol. 378, page 63 | - BARRON, L. D. et al., Progress in Biophysics & Molecular Biology, (20000000), vol. 73, page 1 | - BARRON, L. D.; HECHT, L.; BELL, A. F.; WILSON, G., Appl. Spectrosc., (19960000), vol. 50, page 619 | - MORRIS, E. R. et al., J.C.S. Perkin II, (19750000), vol. 1418 |