EP3646694 - WORK MANAGEMENT SYSTEM FOR A WORKING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/19] | WORK MANAGEMENT SYSTEM AND WORK MANAGEMENT METHOD | ||
[2023/21] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2024 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kubota Corporation 1-2-47 Shikitsuhigashi Naniwa-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 556-8601 / JP | [2020/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAGYU, Sumio c/o Kubota Corporation Sakai Seizosho 64 Ishizukitamachi Sakai-ku Sakai-shi, Osaka 590-0823 / JP | 02 /
NAKAGAWA, Takao c/o Kubota Corporation Sakai Seizosho 64 Ishizukitamachi Sakai-ku Sakai-shi, Osaka 590-0823 / JP | 03 /
KAWANE, Masaru c/o Kubota Corporation Sakai Seizosho 64 Ishizukitamachi Sakai-ku Sakai-shi, Osaka 590-0823 / JP | 04 /
VAN DER MAREL, Piet Jan c/o Kverneland Group Nieuw-Vennep BV Hoofdweg 1278 2153 LR Nieuw-Vennep / NL | [2020/19] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2020/19] | Application number, filing date | 18822733.4 | 18.05.2018 | [2020/19] | WO2018JP19385 | Priority number, date | JP20170126726 | 28.06.2017 Original published format: JP 2017126726 | JP20170126724 | 28.06.2017 Original published format: JP 2017126724 | JP20170126725 | 28.06.2017 Original published format: JP 2017126725 | [2020/19] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019003712 | Date: | 03.01.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3646694 | Date: | 06.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3646694 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.01.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A01C17/00, B60K25/06, B60K17/28 | [2021/13] | CPC: |
A01C17/008 (EP);
B60W30/1888 (US);
A01C17/005 (EP);
A01C17/006 (EP);
B60K17/28 (EP);
B60K25/06 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/19] | A01C19/02, A01B59/042, A01B71/02, B60K25/06, B62D49/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ARBEITSSTEUERUNGSSYSTEM FÜR EINE ARBEITSMASCHINE | [2023/21] | English: | WORK MANAGEMENT SYSTEM FOR A WORKING MACHINE | [2023/21] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE DE TRAVAIL POUR MACHINE DE TRAVAIL | [2023/21] |
Former [2020/19] | ARBEITSVERWALTUNGSSYSTEM UND ARBEITSVERWALTUNGSVERFAHREN | ||
Former [2020/19] | WORK MANAGEMENT SYSTEM AND WORK MANAGEMENT METHOD | ||
Former [2020/19] | SYSTÈME DE GESTION DE TRAVAIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE GESTION DE TRAVAIL | Entry into regional phase | 27.12.2019 | Translation filed | 27.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 27.12.2019 | Search fee paid | 27.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/19] | 22.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.10.2023 | CZ | 11.10.2023 | DK | 11.10.2023 | EE | 11.10.2023 | ES | 11.10.2023 | HR | 11.10.2023 | IT | 11.10.2023 | LT | 11.10.2023 | LV | 11.10.2023 | PL | 11.10.2023 | RO | 11.10.2023 | RS | 11.10.2023 | SE | 11.10.2023 | SK | 11.10.2023 | SM | 11.10.2023 | BG | 11.01.2024 | NO | 11.01.2024 | GR | 12.01.2024 | IS | 11.02.2024 | PT | 12.02.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
CZ | 11.10.2023 | ||
DK | 11.10.2023 | ||
EE | 11.10.2023 | ||
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RO | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
DK | 11.10.2023 | ||
EE | 11.10.2023 | ||
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
DK | 11.10.2023 | ||
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 11.10.2023 | |
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 12.01.2024 | |
IS | 11.02.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]DE2843487 (GAIL JOSEF) [X] 1,3,5,14 * figure 1 * * pages 7-8 * [A] 6,7 [Y] 4,8,9,11-13 [I] 2,10,15; | [YA]DE10145927 (AMAZONEN WERKE DREYER H [DE]) [Y] 4 * figures 1-4; claims 5,6 * * paragraphs [0010] , [0011] , [0020] - [0028] * [A] 1,2,7,14,15; | [A]EP1825739 (ROEGELBERG HOLDING GMBH & CO K [DE]) [A] 1,2,6,14,15 * figures 1-2 * * paragraphs [0002] , [0008] - [0010] - [0018] *; | [YA]US2011015832 (HOYLE DAVID STANLEY [NZ]) [Y] 8 * figures 1-4 * * paragraphs [0041] - [0044] - [0046] , [0049] , [0050] * [A] 1,2,7,14,15; | [YA]DE102011078192 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [Y] 11-13 * figures 1-4 * * paragraphs [0017] , [0026] - [0033] *[A] 1,2,14,15; | [A]EP2675680 (CNH ITALIA SPA [IT]) [A] 6 * figure 1; claims 1-4 * * paragraph [0026] *; | [YA]EP2944175 (AMAZONEN WERKE DREYER H [DE]) [Y] 8,9 * figures 1-5; claims 1,6,10 * * paragraphs [0041] , [0048] , [0059] * [A] 1,2,14,15 | International search | [A]JPS55147121U [A] 1-15 * . *; | [A]JPS609043Y [A] 1-15 * , *; | [A]JPH10290612 (KUBOTA KK) [A] 1-15 * , [0027] - [0030], *; | [A]JPH10313621 (ISEKI AGRICULT MACH) [A] 1-15 * , [0005] - [0009], *; | [A]JP2002087086 (KANZAKI KOKYUKOKI MFG CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * , *; | [A]EP3098106 (IVECO SPA [IT]) [A] 1-15* , [0020] - [0029], Fig. 1 * | by applicant | JP2011245906 |