EP3648271 - EXTERIOR BODY FOR ELECTRICAL WIRE AND WIRE HARNESS WITH EXTERIOR BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Furukawa Electric Co., Ltd. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | For all designated states Furukawa Automotive Systems Inc. 1000 Amago Koura-cho Inukami-gun, Shiga 522-0242 / JP | [2024/03] |
Former [2020/19] | For all designated states Furukawa Electric Co., Ltd. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | ||
For all designated states Furukawa Automotive Systems Inc. 1000 Amago Koura-cho Inukami-gun, Shiga 522-0242 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IKEDA, Hideyuki c/o FURUKAWA ELECTRIC Co. Ltd. 2-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | 02 /
KAMEI, Yoshikazu c/o FURUKAWA ELECTRIC Co. Ltd. 2-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | 03 /
KOJIMA, Naoyuki c/o FURUKAWA ELECTRIC Co. Ltd. 2-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | 04 /
TAKAMURA, Satoshi c/o FURUKAWA ELECTRIC Co. Ltd. 2-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | 05 /
OSHINO, Takashi c/o FURUKAWA ELECTRIC Co. Ltd. 2-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | [2023/40] |
Former [2020/19] | 01 /
IKEDA Hideyuki c/o FURUKAWA ELECTRIC Co. Ltd. 2-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | ||
02 /
KAMEI Yoshikazu c/o FURUKAWA ELECTRIC Co. Ltd. 2-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | |||
03 /
KOJIMA Naoyuki c/o FURUKAWA ELECTRIC Co. Ltd. 2-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | |||
04 /
TAKAMURA Satoshi c/o FURUKAWA ELECTRIC Co. Ltd. 2-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | |||
05 /
OSHINO Takashi c/o FURUKAWA ELECTRIC Co. Ltd. 2-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | Representative(s) | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [2024/03] |
Former [2020/19] | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18823633.5 | 18.05.2018 | [2020/19] | WO2018JP19250 | Priority number, date | JP20170129293 | 30.06.2017 Original published format: JP 2017129293 | JP20170222096 | 17.11.2017 Original published format: JP 2017222096 | [2020/19] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019003704 | Date: | 03.01.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3648271 | Date: | 06.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3648271 | Date: | 17.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.01.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B60R16/02, H02G3/04, H01B7/24 | [2021/13] | CPC: |
B60R16/0215 (EP);
H01B7/24 (US);
H02G3/04 (EP);
H02G3/0462 (US)
|
Former IPC [2020/19] | H02G3/04, H01B7/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUSSENKÖRPER FÜR ELEKTRISCHEN DRAHT UND KABELBAUM MIT AUSSENKÖRPER | [2020/19] | English: | EXTERIOR BODY FOR ELECTRICAL WIRE AND WIRE HARNESS WITH EXTERIOR BODY | [2020/19] | French: | CORPS EXTÉRIEUR DE FIL ÉLECTRIQUE ET FAISCEAU DE FILS À CORPS EXTÉRIEUR | [2020/19] | Entry into regional phase | 29.08.2019 | Translation filed | 29.08.2019 | National basic fee paid | 29.08.2019 | Search fee paid | 29.08.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.08.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.2019 | Examination requested [2020/19] | 03.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.01.2024 | BG | 17.01.2024 | ES | 17.01.2024 | FI | 17.01.2024 | HR | 17.01.2024 | LT | 17.01.2024 | LV | 17.01.2024 | NL | 17.01.2024 | PL | 17.01.2024 | SE | 17.01.2024 | NO | 17.04.2024 | RS | 17.04.2024 | GR | 18.04.2024 | IS | 17.05.2024 | PT | 17.05.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 17.01.2024 | |
BG | 17.01.2024 | ||
ES | 17.01.2024 | ||
FI | 17.01.2024 | ||
HR | 17.01.2024 | ||
LT | 17.01.2024 | ||
LV | 17.01.2024 | ||
NL | 17.01.2024 | ||
PL | 17.01.2024 | ||
NO | 17.04.2024 | ||
RS | 17.04.2024 | ||
GR | 18.04.2024 | ||
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
PT | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 17.01.2024 | |
BG | 17.01.2024 | ||
ES | 17.01.2024 | ||
FI | 17.01.2024 | ||
HR | 17.01.2024 | ||
LT | 17.01.2024 | ||
NL | 17.01.2024 | ||
NO | 17.04.2024 | ||
RS | 17.04.2024 | ||
GR | 18.04.2024 | ||
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 17.01.2024 | |
FI | 17.01.2024 | ||
HR | 17.01.2024 | ||
LT | 17.01.2024 | ||
NL | 17.01.2024 | ||
NO | 17.04.2024 | ||
RS | 17.04.2024 | ||
GR | 18.04.2024 | ||
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 17.01.2024 | |
NL | 17.01.2024 | ||
NO | 17.04.2024 | ||
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | NL | 17.01.2024 | |
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/31] | NL | 17.01.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1174458 (HUNTSMAN INT LLC [US]) [Y] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0011] , [0013] , [0054] , [0055] , [0060] , [0061] *; | [A]EP2518735 (AUTONETWORKS TECHNOLOGIES LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract ** paragraphs [0062] , [0063] , [0207] - [0209] - [0238] , [ 239] *; | [A]WO2016044826 (FEDERAL MOGUL POWERTRAIN INC [US]) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [Y]WO2016203969 (AUTONETWORKS TECHNOLOGIES LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0058] - [0060] * | International search | [A]JP2001261874 (TOYO TIRE & RUBBER CO) [A] 1-12 * (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2004504463 (HUNTSMAN INTERNATIONAL LLC) [A] 1-12 * & US 2003/0158275 A1 & EP 1174458 A1 & WO 02/08323 A1 & CN 1443214 A *; | [A]JP2013127866 (YAZAKI CORP) [A] 1-12 * (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2014141548 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP) [A] 1-12* (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2017022803 (AUTO NETWORK GIJUTSU KENKYUSHO KK , et al) [A] 1-12 * & WO 2017/006735 A1 * | by applicant | WO2015016056 |