Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11419855 | Global Dossier | 23.08.2022 | B2 | US2020121649 | 23.04.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2017129378 | 30.06.2017 | WO2018JP24888 | 29.06.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20240104205 | Global Dossier | 04.07.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20197038645 | 29.06.2018 | JP2017129378 | 30.06.2017 | WO2018JP24888 | 29.06.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20200021481 | Global Dossier | 28.02.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2017129378 | 30.06.2017 | WO2018JP24888 | 29.06.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPWO2019004453 | Global Dossier | 30.04.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2017129378 | 30.06.2017 | WO2018JP24888 | 29.06.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2024033015 | Global Dossier | 12.03.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2022065284 | 11.04.2022 | JP2017129378 | 30.06.2017 | WO2018JP24888 | 29.06.2018 | JP2019527076 | 29.06.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2022082823 | Global Dossier | 02.06.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2017129378 | 30.06.2017 | WO2018JP24888 | 29.06.2018 | JP2019527076 | 29.06.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110809470 | Global Dossier | 18.02.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2017129378 | 30.06.2017 | WO2018JP24888 | 29.06.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3646866 | Global Dossier | 24.03.2021 | A4 | EP3646866 | 06.05.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2017129378 | 30.06.2017 | WO2018JP24888 | 29.06.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019004453 | Global Dossier | 03.01.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2017129378 | 30.06.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2019011328 | Global Dossier | 24.01.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2017129378 | 30.06.2017 |