EP3646866 - PHARMACEUTICAL PREPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.12.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2024 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kowa Company, Ltd. 6-29 Nishiki 3-chome Naka-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 460-8625 / JP | [2020/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUGIMOTO, Shin c/o KOWA COMPANY, Ltd. Fuji Research Laboratories 332-1 Ohnoshinden Fuji-shi Shizuoka 417-8650 / JP | 02 /
MINAMIZONO, Akito c/o KOWA COMPANY, Ltd. Fuji Research Laboratories 332-1 Ohnoshinden Fuji-shi Shizuoka 417-8650 / JP | [2020/19] | Representative(s) | Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Weinstraße 8 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/19] | Schiener, Jens Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Weinstraße 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18824445.3 | 29.06.2018 | [2020/19] | WO2018JP24888 | Priority number, date | JP20170129378 | 30.06.2017 Original published format: JP 2017129378 | [2020/19] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019004453 | Date: | 03.01.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3646866 | Date: | 06.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.01.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/423, A61K9/20, A61K47/38, A61P3/06, A61P43/00, A61K9/16, A61K9/48 | [2021/12] | CPC: |
A61K9/2054 (EP,KR);
A61K31/423 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/38 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/16 (US);
A61K9/1652 (EP,KR);
A61K9/20 (US);
A61K9/48 (US);
A61K9/4866 (EP,KR);
A61P3/06 (EP,KR);
A61P43/00 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/19] | A61K31/423, A61K9/20, A61K47/38, A61P3/06, A61P43/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/19] | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHES PRÄPARAT | [2020/19] | English: | PHARMACEUTICAL PREPARATION | [2020/19] | French: | PRÉPARATION PHARMACEUTIQUE | [2020/19] | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.2020 | Translation filed | 15.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.2020 | Search fee paid | 15.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/19] | 07.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP2141155 (KOWA CO [JP]); | [X]EP3020401 (KOWA CO [JP]); | [X]WO2016192680 (TRIASTEK INC [CN]); | International search | [A]WO2005023777 (KOWA CO [JP], et al); | [A]WO2014024268 (KOWA CO [JP], et al); | [A]WO2014051023 (SANWA KAGAKU KENKYUSHO CO [JP], et al); | [A]WO2014050134 (KOWA CO [JP]); | [Y]WO2014065427 (SANWA KAGAKU KENKYUSHO CO [JP], et al); | [Y]WO2015005365 (KOWA CO [JP]); | by applicant | WO2005023777 | US7109226 | WO2015005365 |