EP3647389 - PROTEIN ADSORPTION PREVENTING AGENT, PROTEIN ADSORPTION PREVENTING FILM, AND MEDICAL TOOL USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Maruzen Petrochemical Co., Ltd. 1-1, Irifune 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8502 / JP | [2020/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHIURA Takao c/o Maruzen Petrochemical Co. Ltd. Research Center 3 Goi Minami-Kaigan Ichihara-shi Chiba 290-8503 / JP | [2020/19] | Representative(s) | Kraus & Lederer PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/19] | Beckmann, Claus Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18824772.0 | 06.04.2018 | [2020/19] | WO2018JP14738 | Priority number, date | JP20170124013 | 26.06.2017 Original published format: JP 2017124013 | [2020/19] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019003558 | Date: | 03.01.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3647389 | Date: | 06.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3647389 | Date: | 10.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.01.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C08F8/30, C08F116/14, C09D129/10, C09D153/00, A61L31/06, C12M3/00, C08F216/14, C08F297/00 | [2023/04] | CPC: |
C08F297/00 (EP,KR,US);
C09K3/00 (KR);
A61L31/06 (EP,KR);
A61L31/10 (US);
A61L31/14 (US);
C08F116/14 (EP);
C08F16/16 (KR);
C08F216/1433 (EP,US);
C08F8/30 (EP);
C09D129/00 (KR);
C09D129/10 (EP,US);
C09D153/00 (EP,US);
C12M3/00 (EP,KR);
A61L2400/18 (US);
A61L2420/02 (US);
A61L2420/06 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F216/1433, C08F216/20 (EP);
C08F8/30, C08F116/14 (EP) |
Former IPC [2020/19] | C09K3/00, C08F16/16, C09D129/00, C12M3/00, A61K47/34, A61L31/06, C08F297/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MITTEL ZUR VERHINDERUNG VON PROTEINADSORPTION, PROTEINADSORPTIONSVERHINDERNDER FILM UND MEDIZINISCHES INSTRUMENT DAMIT | [2020/19] | English: | PROTEIN ADSORPTION PREVENTING AGENT, PROTEIN ADSORPTION PREVENTING FILM, AND MEDICAL TOOL USING SAME | [2020/19] | French: | INHIBITEUR D'ADSORPTION DE PROTÉINE, ET FILM D'INHIBITION D'ADSORPTION DE PROTÉINE AINSI QU'INSTRUMENT MÉDICAL METTANT EN UVRE CELUI-CI | [2020/19] | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.2020 | Translation filed | 14.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 14.01.2020 | Search fee paid | 14.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/19] | 19.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.02.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.05.2023 | CZ | 10.05.2023 | DK | 10.05.2023 | EE | 10.05.2023 | ES | 10.05.2023 | FI | 10.05.2023 | HR | 10.05.2023 | IT | 10.05.2023 | LT | 10.05.2023 | LV | 10.05.2023 | NL | 10.05.2023 | PL | 10.05.2023 | RO | 10.05.2023 | RS | 10.05.2023 | SE | 10.05.2023 | SI | 10.05.2023 | SK | 10.05.2023 | SM | 10.05.2023 | NO | 10.08.2023 | GR | 11.08.2023 | IS | 10.09.2023 | PT | 11.09.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/24] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
CZ | 10.05.2023 | ||
DK | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SI | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
CZ | 10.05.2023 | ||
DK | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 10.05.2023 | |
PT | 11.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2013099427 (MARUZEN PETROCHEM CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 6* paragraphs [0074] , [0087]; claims 1-2 *; | [Y]JP2015117291 (MARUZEN PETROCHEM CO LTD) [Y] 6 * paragraph [0045]; claims 1-3 *; | [XDY]JP2016050266 (UNIV KYUSHU, et al) [XD] 1-5,7-11 * paragraphs [0013] , [0040] , [0041] , [0043]; claim - * [Y] 6 | International search | [A]US4028295 (LOSHAEK SAMUEL) [A] 1-11* , *; | [A]JP2004018639 (CANON KK) [A] 1-11 * , *; | [A]JP4528601B [A] 1-11 * , *; | [A]WO2015050036 (KANEKA CORP [JP]) [A] 1-11 * , & US 2016/0250391 A1 & EP 3053975 A1 & CN 105593320 A *; | [X]JP2016050266 (UNIV KYUSHU, et al) [X] 1-11 * , *; | [A]JP2016182690 (TOSOH CORP) [A] 1-11 * , [0032] *; | [A]JP2016198426 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS) [A] 1-11 * , [0105] - *; | [PX]WO2017150000 (MARUZEN PETROCHEM CO LTD [JP], et al) [PX] 1-11 * , *; | [PA]WO2017204306 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [PA] 1-11 * , * | by applicant | JPS60228509 | JPS62257910 | JPH01108202 | JPH01108203 | JPH072805B | JP3096494B | JP4528601B | JP2013057058 | JP2016050266 |