EP3547947 - SURGICAL APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.03.2024 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Board of Regents of the University of Texas System 210 West 7th Street Austin, TX 78701 / US | For all designated states Endoquest Robotics, Inc. 9310 Kirby Drive, Suite 100 Houston, TX 77054 / US | [2022/46] |
Former [2019/41] | For all designated states The Board of Regents of the University of Texas System 210 West 7th Street Austin, TX 78701 / US | ||
For all designated states Colubrismx, Inc. 9330 Kirby Drive Suite 900 Houston, Texas 77054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Daniel H. 327 Terrace Drive Houston Texas 77007 / US | 02 /
SHIN, Dong Suk 4310 Dunlavy Street 445 Houston Texas 77006 / US | 03 /
JANG, Taeho 1885 El Paseo Street 823 Houston Texas 77054 / US | 04 /
PARK, Yongman 1885 El Paseo Street 238 Houston Texas 77054 / US | 05 /
LEE, Jeihan 7900 Cambridge Street 18-2B Houston Texas 77054 / US | 06 /
KIM, Hongmin 7600 Kirby Drive 270 Houston Texas 77030 / US | 07 /
NAM, Kihoon 8333 Braesmain Drive, nr. 1207 Houston Texas 77025 / US | 08 /
HAN, Seokyung 7675 Phoenix Drive 1028 Houston Texas 77030 / US | [2019/45] |
Former [2019/41] | 01 /
KIM, Daniel H. 327 Terrace Drive Houston Texas 77007 / US | ||
02 /
SHIN, Dong Suk 4310 Dunlavy Street 445 Houston Texas 77006 / US | |||
03 /
JANG, Taeho 1885 El Paseo Street 823 Houston Texas 77054 / US | |||
04 /
PARK, Yongman 1885 El Paseo Street 238 Houston Texas 77054 / US | |||
05 /
LEE, Jeihan 7900 Cambridge Street 18-2B Houston Texas 77054 / US | |||
06 /
KIM, Hongmin 7600 Kirby Drive 270 Houston Texas 77030 / US | |||
07 /
NAM, Kihoon 8333 Braesmain Drive Houston Texas 77025 / US | |||
08 /
HAN, Seokyung 7675 Phoenix Drive 1028 Houston Texas 77030 / US | Representative(s) | EP&C P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [2019/41] | Application number, filing date | 18825116.9 | 28.06.2018 | [2019/41] | WO2018US39943 | Priority number, date | US201762526881P | 29.06.2017 Original published format: US 201762526881 P | [2019/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2019006087 | Date: | 03.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/01] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3547947 | Date: | 09.10.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 21.02.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61B34/30, A61B17/29, A61B34/00, A61B17/00 | [2019/41] | CPC: |
A61B34/30 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61B34/74 (EP,CN,US);
A61B34/71 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61B1/0016 (EP,CN);
A61B1/018 (EP,CN);
A61B17/29 (EP,CN,KR);
A61B17/295 (CN,US);
A61B17/320016 (EP,CN,US);
A61B1/0051 (EP);
A61B2017/00017 (EP,CN);
A61B2017/00265 (CN,KR);
A61B2017/00296 (CN,KR);
A61B2017/00309 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/00314 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/00318 (CN,KR);
A61B2017/00327 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/00477 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/00876 (EP,CN);
A61B2017/2906 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/2908 (CN,KR);
A61B2034/301 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61B2034/303 (CN,KR);
A61B2034/306 (CN,KR);
A61B2034/715 (US);
A61B34/37 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/41] | Title | German: | CHIRURGISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2019/41] | English: | SURGICAL APPARATUS | [2019/41] | French: | APPAREIL CHIRURGICAL | [2019/41] | Entry into regional phase | 03.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 03.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 03.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/41] | 02.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Divisional application(s) | EP20204919.3 / EP3799822 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2010002544 (INTUITIVE SURGICAL INC [US]) [Y] 1-11 * paragraphs [0035] - [0038] - [0043] , [0044] , [0051] - [0062] - [0069] - [0071] - [0074] , [0076] , [0167]; figures 1-10 *; | [A]US2010331856 (CARLSON CHRISTOPHER R [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0021] - [0029]; figures 1-10C *; | [A]WO2012015816 (UNIV COLUMBIA [US], et al) [A] 1-11* paragraphs [0026] - [0055]; figures 1-9B *; | [Y]US2015230697 (PHEE SOO JAY LOUIS [SG], et al) [Y] 1-11 * paragraphs [0107] , [0110] , [0112] , [0114]; figures 1-12 *; | [A]EP2996613 (TITAN MED INC [CA]) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0087] - [0108] - [0114]; figures 1-32 *; | [A]WO2016148642 (ENDOMASTER PTE LTD [SG], et al) [A] 1-11 * page 2, line 1 - page 8, line 6; figures 1A-18D * | International search | [A]US2004138529 (WILTSHIRE BRENT R [US], et al) [A] 1-11, 22-33 * See the whole document. *; | [A]US2006264705 (ADAMS RONALD [US], et al) [A] 1-11, 22-33* See the whole document. *; | [A]US2007239186 (WEITZNER BARRY D [US], et al) [A] 1-11, 22-33 * See the whole document. *; | [XY]US2008287963 (ROGERS THEODORE W [US], et al) [X] 22-28, 30-33 * See paragraphs [0035]-[0106]; figures 1A-5C. * [Y] 1-11, 29; | [Y]US2011301416 (DEJIMA TAKUMI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-11, 29 * See paragraphs [0200], [0201]; figures 22, 23, 30, 31. * |