EP3645424 - TANK FOR PRESSURE SEWER INSTALLATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.07.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states South East Water Corporation Waters Edge 101 Wells Street Frankston, VIC 3199 / AU | [2020/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CASEY, Eamon c/- South East Water Corporation 101 Wells Street Frankston, Victoria 3199 / AU | 02 /
PASTULOVIC, Paul c/- South East Water Corporation 101 Wells Street Frankston, Victoria 3199 / AU | [2023/52] |
Former [2020/19] | 01 /
CASEY, Eamon c/- South East Water Corporation 101 Wells Street Frankston Victoria 3199 / AU | ||
02 /
PASTULOVIC, Paul c/- South East Water Corporation 101 Wells Street Frankston Victoria 3199 / AU | Representative(s) | Lavoix Bayerstraße 83 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/19] | Lavoix Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18825373.6 | 29.06.2018 | [2020/19] | WO2018AU50678 | Priority number, date | AU20170902555 | 30.06.2017 Original published format: AU 2017902555 | [2020/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019000052 | Date: | 03.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3645424 | Date: | 06.05.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 03.01.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B65D90/10, B65D88/76, E03F5/10, E03F5/22, E03F5/02 | [2021/11] | CPC: |
E03F5/024 (EP,US);
B65D88/76 (US);
E03F5/22 (EP,US);
Y10T137/6991 (US)
|
Former IPC [2020/19] | B65D90/10, B65D88/76, E03F5/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/19] | Title | German: | TANK FÜR DRUCKABWASSERANLAGE | [2020/19] | English: | TANK FOR PRESSURE SEWER INSTALLATION | [2020/19] | French: | RÉSERVOIR POUR INSTALLATION D'ÉGOUT SOUS PRESSION | [2020/19] | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 14.01.2020 | Search fee paid | 14.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 14.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/19] | 03.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2024 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2002005220 (STRUTHERS KEVIN D [US]); | [XYI]EP1894857 (GRAF PLASTICS GMBH [DE]); | [Y]EP2085326 (GRAF PLASTICS GMBH [DE]); | [XYI]EP2374735 (GRAF PLASTICS GMBH [DE]) | International search | [XY]US4359167 (FOUSS JAMES L, et al); | [XY]US4709723 (SIDAWAY H JOHN [US], et al); | [XY]US5816510 (EARLE III GEORGE A [US], et al); | [XY]DE19914008 (RUEHLAND LOTHAR [DE]); | [XY]US2005035144 (SACCHI FABRICIO DE ARAUJO [BR]) | by applicant | US2002005220 | EP1894857 | EP2374735 | WO2012AU00903 | WO2017AU50058 |