EP3741122 - RESTRICTED OVERLAPPED BLOCK MOTION COMPENSATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.01.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.01.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.07.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (PUBL) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2020/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YU, Ruoyang Attundagränd 2 183 39 Täby / SE | 02 /
ANDERSSON, Kenneth Västra Trädgårdsvägen 52 802 63 GÄVLE / SE | 03 /
WENNERSTEN, Per Skedviksvägen 48 120 54 ÅRSTA / SE | [2020/52] |
Former [2020/48] | 01 /
YU, Ruoyang Carl Thunbergs Väg 7 169 69 SOLNA / SE | ||
02 /
ANDERSSON, Kenneth Västra Trädgårdsvägen 52 802 63 GÄVLE / SE | |||
03 /
WENNERSTEN, Per Skedviksvägen 48 120 54 ÅRSTA / SE | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2020/48] | Application number, filing date | 18825636.6 | 14.12.2018 | [2020/48] | WO2018EP85009 | Priority number, date | US201862617398P | 15.01.2018 Original published format: US 201862617398 P | [2020/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019137735 | Date: | 18.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3741122 | Date: | 25.11.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3741122 | Date: | 02.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/583, H04N19/513, H04N19/176 | [2020/48] | CPC: |
H04N19/583 (EP,US);
H04N19/105 (US);
H04N19/132 (US);
H04N19/176 (EP,US);
H04N19/46 (US);
H04N19/513 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINGESCHRÄNKTE ÜBERLAPPTE BLOCKBEWEGUNGSKOMPENSATION | [2020/48] | English: | RESTRICTED OVERLAPPED BLOCK MOTION COMPENSATION | [2020/48] | French: | COMPENSATION DE MOUVEMENT DE BLOC À CHEVAUCHEMENT RESTREINT | [2020/48] | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/48] | 02.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.12.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.01.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 05.12.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.12.2018 | AL | 02.03.2022 | AT | 02.03.2022 | CY | 02.03.2022 | CZ | 02.03.2022 | DK | 02.03.2022 | EE | 02.03.2022 | ES | 02.03.2022 | FI | 02.03.2022 | HR | 02.03.2022 | IT | 02.03.2022 | LT | 02.03.2022 | LV | 02.03.2022 | MC | 02.03.2022 | MK | 02.03.2022 | PL | 02.03.2022 | RO | 02.03.2022 | RS | 02.03.2022 | SE | 02.03.2022 | SI | 02.03.2022 | SK | 02.03.2022 | SM | 02.03.2022 | BG | 02.06.2022 | NO | 02.06.2022 | GR | 03.06.2022 | IS | 02.07.2022 | PT | 04.07.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/27] | HU | 14.12.2018 | |
AL | 02.03.2022 | ||
AT | 02.03.2022 | ||
CY | 02.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
DK | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
ES | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
MK | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SI | 02.03.2022 | ||
SK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
IS | 02.07.2022 | ||
PT | 04.07.2022 | ||
Former [2024/24] | HU | 14.12.2018 | |
AL | 02.03.2022 | ||
AT | 02.03.2022 | ||
CY | 02.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
DK | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
ES | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SI | 02.03.2022 | ||
SK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
IS | 02.07.2022 | ||
PT | 04.07.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 02.03.2022 | |
AT | 02.03.2022 | ||
CY | 02.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
DK | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
ES | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SI | 02.03.2022 | ||
SK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
IS | 02.07.2022 | ||
PT | 04.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 02.03.2022 | |
AT | 02.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
DK | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
ES | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SI | 02.03.2022 | ||
SK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
IS | 02.07.2022 | ||
PT | 04.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 02.03.2022 | |
AT | 02.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
DK | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
ES | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SI | 02.03.2022 | ||
SK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
IS | 02.07.2022 | ||
PT | 04.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AL | 02.03.2022 | |
AT | 02.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
DK | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
ES | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
IS | 02.07.2022 | ||
PT | 04.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 02.03.2022 | |
AT | 02.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
ES | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
IS | 02.07.2022 | ||
PT | 04.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 02.03.2022 | |
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
ES | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
IS | 02.07.2022 | ||
PT | 04.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 02.03.2022 | |
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
ES | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
PT | 04.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 02.03.2022 | |
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
ES | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
PT | 04.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 02.03.2022 | |
ES | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
PT | 04.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | ES | 02.03.2022 | |
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | ES | 02.03.2022 | |
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | ES | 02.03.2022 | |
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | ES | 02.03.2022 | |
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 02.03.2022 | |
NO | 02.06.2022 | Cited in | International search | [XYI]WO2016123068 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [X] 27-30,37,38,44-46,49-55,62,63,69-71,74-76 * paragraph [0147] - paragraph [0152] * [Y] 47,48,72,73 [I] 31,42,43,56,67,68; | [XA]US9503720 (CHEN YING [US], et al) [X] 1,6,11-14,19,24-26 * abstract * * column 7, line 4 - line 13 * * column 14, line 59 - column 15, line 2 * [A] 2-5,7-10,15-18,20-23; | [XAI] - LAROCHE G ET AL, "RD Optimized Coding for Motion Vector Predictor Selection", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS FOR VIDEO TECHNOLOGY, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, US, (20080901), vol. 18, no. 9, doi:10.1109/TCSVT.2008.928882, ISSN 1051-8215, pages 1247 - 1257, XP011231739 [X] 1,2,11-15,24-26 * abstract * * figures 1,2, 4, 5 * * Section III.A. * [A] 4,6-10,17,19-23 [I] 3,5,16,18 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCSVT.2008.928882 | [XAY] - J-L LIN ET AL, "Improved Advanced Motion Vector Prediction", 4. JCT-VC MEETING; 95. MPEG MEETING; 20-1-2011 - 28-1-2011; DAEGU;(JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20110115), no. JCTVC-D125, XP030008165 [X] 1,6-9,11-14,19-22,24-26 * abstract * * section 2.3 * [A] 2-5,10,15-18,23 [Y] 47,48,72,73 | [XA] - CHEN J ET AL, "JVET-G1001- Algorithm description of Joint Exploration Test Model 7 (JEM7)", (20170819), pages i - iv, 1, JOINT VIDEO EXPLORATION TEAM (JVET)OF ITU-T SG 16 WP 3 AND ISO/IEC JTC 1/SC 29/WG 11, 7TH MEETING, 13-7-2017 - 21-7-2017; TORINO, URL: http://phenix.int-evry.fr/jvet/doc_end_user/documents/7_Torino/wg11/JVET-G0001-v1.zip, XP030150980 [X] 1,4,10-14,17-27,49-52,74-76 * abstract * * section 2.3.4 * [A] 2,3,5-9,15,16 | [X] - HU N ET AL, "Unification of parameter derivation for CCLM and LIC", 4. JVET MEETING; 15-10-2016 - 21-10-2016; CHENGDU; (THE JOINT VIDEO EXPLORATION TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://PHENIX.INT-EVRY.FR/JVET/,, (20161016), no. JVET-D0122-v2, XP030150374 [X] 27,39,40,49-52,64,65,74-76 * section 2.2.2 * | [XP] - SJÖBERG R ET AL, "Description of SDR and HDR video coding technology proposal by Ericsson and Nokia", 10. JVET MEETING; 10-4-2018 - 20-4-2018; SAN DIEGO; (THE JOINT VIDEO EXPLORATION TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://PHENIX.INT-EVRY.FR/JVET/,, (20180413), no. JVET-J0012-v2, XP030151169 [XP] 27-76 * section 2.1.7.2 * |