Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2020367485 | Global Dossier | 26.11.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1761224 | 27.11.2017 | WO2018FR53002 | 27.11.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN111386041 | Global Dossier | 07.07.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | FR1761224 | 27.11.2017 | WO2018FR53002 | 27.11.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3082707 | Global Dossier | 31.05.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1761224 | 27.11.2017 | WO2018FR53002 | 27.11.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3694318 | Global Dossier | 19.08.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1761224 | 27.11.2017 | WO2018FR53002 | 27.11.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019102166 | Global Dossier | 31.05.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1761224 | 27.11.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR113550 | 13.05.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1761224 | 27.11.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR3074014 | 03.12.2021 | B1 | FR3074014 | 31.05.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1761224 | 27.11.2017 |