30.08.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] |
19.07.2024 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] |
12.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] |
24.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] |
17.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] |
10.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] |
03.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] |
19.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] |
12.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
01.03.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] |
16.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] |
09.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] |
02.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] |
26.01.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] |
19.01.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] |
11.08.2023 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 13.09.2023 [2023/37] |
04.08.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
04.08.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
02.08.2023 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
26.06.2023 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
02.06.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 05.07.2023 [2023/27] |
02.06.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 05.07.2023 [2023/27] |
03.01.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.01.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.02.2021 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 31.03.2021 [2021/13] |
26.02.2021 |
Change - extension states |
published on 31.03.2021 [2021/13] |
01.02.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
13.01.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.09.2020 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 28.10.2020 [2020/44] |
25.09.2020 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
25.09.2020 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 28.10.2020 [2020/44] |
31.08.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.07.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.03.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.02.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.06.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.06.2019 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
08.01.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|