Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11585945 | Global Dossier | 21.02.2023 | B2 | US2020386897 | 10.12.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018EP84496 | 12.12.2018 | DE102017223200 | 19.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7038830B | Global Dossier | 18.03.2022 | B2 | JP2021508047 | 25.02.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018EP84496 | 12.12.2018 | DE102017223200 | 19.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN111492267 | Global Dossier | 04.08.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018EP84496 | 12.12.2018 | DE102017223200 | 19.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3729138 | Global Dossier | 13.09.2023 | B1 | EP3729138 | 28.10.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018EP84496 | 12.12.2018 | DE102017223200 | 19.12.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019121211 | Global Dossier | 27.06.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102017223200 | 19.12.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102017223200 | 19.06.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102017223200 | 19.12.2017 |