Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11453563 | Global Dossier | 27.09.2022 | B2 | US2020216278 | 09.07.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102018112307 | 23.05.2018 | WO2018EP84940 | 14.12.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN111132917B | Global Dossier | 17.09.2021 | B | CN111132917 | 08.05.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102018112307 | 23.05.2018 | WO2018EP84940 | 14.12.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3621906 | Global Dossier | 24.03.2021 | B1 | EP3621906 | 18.03.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102018112307 | 23.05.2018 | WO2018EP84940 | 14.12.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2872928T | 03.11.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE102018112307 | 23.05.2018 | WO2018EP84940 | 14.12.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HRP20210589T | 21.01.2022 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE102018112307 | 23.05.2018 | EP18825957 | 14.12.2018 | WO2018EP84940 | 14.12.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3621906T | 27.09.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE102018112307 | 23.05.2018 | EP18825957 | 14.12.2018 | WO2018EP84940 | 14.12.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019223891 | Global Dossier | 28.11.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102018112307 | 23.05.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102018112307 | 28.11.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102018112307 | 23.05.2018 |