EP3728089 - MATERIAL-PROVIDING SYSTEM FOR A MANUFACTURING INSTALLATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.04.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.08.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.04.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.05.2023 [2023/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brose Fahrzeugteile SE & Co. Kommanditgesellschaft, Coburg Max-Brose-Straße 1 96450 Coburg / DE | [2020/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WOLDRICH, Stefan Schilligstück 29 96472 Rödental / DE | 02 /
WALTER, Florian Falkeneggstraße 26 Coburg 96450 / DE | [2020/44] | Representative(s) | Gottschald Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Klaus-Bungert-Straße 1 40468 Düsseldorf / DE | [2020/44] | Application number, filing date | 18826062.4 | 21.12.2018 | [2020/44] | WO2018EP86581 | Priority number, date | DE201710131294 | 23.12.2017 Original published format: DE102017131294 | [2020/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019122328 | Date: | 27.06.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3728089 | Date: | 28.10.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B65G65/00, B65G1/08 | [2020/44] | CPC: |
B65G65/00 (EP,US);
B65G1/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/44] | Title | German: | MATERIALBEREITSTELLUNGSSYSTEM FÜR EINE FERTIGUNGSANLAGE | [2020/44] | English: | MATERIAL-PROVIDING SYSTEM FOR A MANUFACTURING INSTALLATION | [2020/44] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ALIMENTATION EN MATÉRIAU DESTINÉ À UNE INSTALLATION DE PRODUCTION | [2020/44] | Entry into regional phase | 23.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 23.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/44] | 23.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/22] | 25.01.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2022 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3674159 (LEMEISON JEROME H) [Y] 9 * columns 1-15; figures 1-14 *; | [X]JPS5670202 (SEIKOO SEISAKUSHO KK) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [X]GB2080265 (FARR KENNETH) [X] 1 * pages 1-9; figures 1-21 *; | [X]US4492504 (HAINSWORTH THOMAS E [US]) [X] 1,3-5,11-15 * columns 1-16; figures 1-16 *; | [X]JPS61206709 (MOTODA ELECTRONICS) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [A]JPH0262304 (SEIBU ELECTRIC & MACHINERY CO) [A] 9* abstract *; | [X]DE29817529U (WILLACH GMBH GEB [DE]) [X] 1,3,4,6,7 * pages 1-20; figures 1-10 *; | [X]US7261510 (MOTOORI YOICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1 * columns 1-12; figures 1-7 *; | [A]DE102012109162 (NEDCON MAGAZIJNINRICHTING BV [NL]) [A] 9 * pages 1-6; figures 1-6 *; | [XY]DE102015000968 (SERVUS INTRALOGISTICS GMBH [AT]) [X] 1-4,6,8,10 * pages 1-9; figures 1-10 * [Y] 9 |