Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP3804060
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
27.01.2023 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 01.03.2023 [2023/09] |
22.10.2022 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
20.05.2022 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.05.2022 |
First examination report |
|
16.12.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.08.2021 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 22.09.2021 [2021/38] |
06.08.2021 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 08.09.2021 [2021/36] |
06.08.2021 |
Change - extension states |
published on 08.09.2021 [2021/36] |
23.07.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
12.03.2021 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 14.04.2021 [2021/15] |
12.03.2021 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
12.03.2021 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 14.04.2021 [2021/15] |
22.02.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.12.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.12.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.12.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.12.2020 |
Change - representative |
|
05.12.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.12.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.12.2019 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
10.01.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|