|
19.01.2024 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2023 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2023 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2023 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.01.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.01.2023 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.01.2023 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
31.01.2023 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.10.2022 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2022 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.10.2022 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.10.2022 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2022 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
69 |
|
07.10.2022 |
Text intended for grant (sequence listing) |
Search / examination |
122 |
|
07.10.2022 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
69 |
|
12.01.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.01.2022 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
53 |
|
12.01.2022 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.01.2022 |
Description |
Search / examination |
52 |
|
12.01.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.2022 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.09.2021 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.09.2021 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.09.2021 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2021 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.01.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.01.2021 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.01.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.2020 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.2020 |
Change to the inventor details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.09.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.09.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.09.2020 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.2020 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.09.2020 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.08.2020 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.08.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2020 |
Priority search results copy provided by EPO |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
30.07.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.2020 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.07.2020 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
15.05.2020 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.09.2019 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
13.09.2019 |
Incoming letter related to PCT RO |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
13.09.2019 |
Incoming letter related to PCT RO |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
07.08.2019 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
07.08.2019 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.08.2019 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
30.07.2019 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
136 |
|
24.07.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
24.07.2019 |
Incoming letter related to PCT RO |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
24.07.2019 |
Incoming letter related to PCT RO |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
24.07.2019 |
Incoming letter related to PCT RO |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
11.07.2019 |
Sequence listing |
Search / examination |
- |
|
11.07.2019 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.07.2019 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
72 |
|
19.06.2019 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
19.06.2019 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
19.06.2019 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
19.06.2019 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
05.06.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
05.06.2019 |
Incoming letter related to PCT RO |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
05.06.2019 |
Incoming letter related to PCT RO |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
14.02.2019 |
ISR: cited documents |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
13.02.2019 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
13.02.2019 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
13.02.2019 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
15.01.2019 |
Communication in cases for which no other form is applicable |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
15.01.2019 |
Notification of receipt of Search copy |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
11.01.2019 |
Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
10.01.2019 |
Notification of the international application number and of the international filing date |
PCT receiving Office |
5 |
|
31.12.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
31.12.2018 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
31.12.2018 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
5 |
|
31.12.2018 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
52 |
|
31.12.2018 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
31.12.2018 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
13 |
|
31.12.2018 |
Electronic request for grant of an International application |
PCT receiving Office |
4 |
|
31.12.2018 |
Priority document (RO-procedure) |
PCT receiving Office |
135 |
|
31.12.2018 |
Submission concerning representation |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |