EP3649238 - IMPROVED METHANE MONOOXYGENASE ENZYMES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.04.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Industrial Microbes, Inc. 1250 45th Street Suite 330 Emeryville, CA 94608 / US | [2020/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CLARKE, Elizabeth Jane c/o INDUSTRIAL MICROBES INC. 1250 45th Street Suite 330 Emeryville California 94608 / US | 02 /
GREENFIELD, Derek Lorin c/o INDUSTRIAL MICROBES INC. 1250 45th Street Suite 330 Emeryville, California 94608 / US | 03 /
HELMAN, Noah Charles c/o INDUSTRIAL MICROBES INC. 1250 45th Street Suite 330 Emeryville, California 94608 / US | 04 /
JONES, Stephanie Rhianon c/o INDUSTRIAL MICROBES INC. 1250 45th Street Suite 330 Emeryville, California 94608 / US | 05 /
ZHU, Baolong c/o INDUSTRIAL MICROBES INC. 1250 45th Street Suite 330 Emeryville, California 94608 / US | [2020/20] | Representative(s) | Schiweck Weinzierl Koch Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Ganghoferstraße 68 B 80339 München / DE | [2020/20] | Application number, filing date | 18827684.4 | 06.07.2018 | [2020/20] | WO2018US41149 | Priority number, date | US201762529648P | 07.07.2017 Original published format: US 201762529648 P | US201762542838P | 09.08.2017 Original published format: US 201762542838 P | US201762566733P | 02.10.2017 Original published format: US 201762566733 P | [2020/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019010455 | Date: | 10.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3649238 | Date: | 13.05.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.01.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.01.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/00, C12N9/02, C12N15/00 | [2020/20] | CPC: |
C12N9/0073 (EP,US);
C07K14/195 (EP);
C12N15/70 (US);
C12N15/75 (US);
C12N15/77 (US);
C12Y114/13025 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/20] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE METHAN-MONOOXYGENASE-ENZYME | [2020/20] | English: | IMPROVED METHANE MONOOXYGENASE ENZYMES | [2020/20] | French: | ENZYMES DE MONO-OXYGÉNASE DE MÉTHANE AMÉLIORÉES | [2020/20] | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.2020 | Search fee paid | 30.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/20] | 28.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2017183638 (JUNG YUKYUNG [KR], et al) [I] 1-13 * paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0086] * * figure 5 * * sequence 1 *; | [I]KR20170025215 (UNIV KONKUK IND COOP CORP [KR]) [I] 1-13 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0036] * * claim 1 * * paragraph [0018] *; | [A] - JOSEPH G. LEAHY ET AL, "Evolution of the soluble diiron monooxygenases", FEMS MICROBIOLOGY REVIEWS, (20031001), vol. 27, no. 4, doi:10.1016/S0168-6445(03)00023-8, pages 449 - 479, XP055595999 [A] 1-13 * abstract * * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0168-6445(03)00023-8 | [A] - WARD NAOMI ET AL, Genomic insights into methanotrophy: The complete genome sequence of Methylococcus capsulatus (Bath), PLOS BIOLOGY, VOL. 2, NR. 10, PAGE(S) 1616-1628, (200410), XP002720907 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pbio.0020303 | [A] - Thomas J. Smith ET AL, "Mutagenesis of Soluble Methane Monooxygenase", Methods in Methane Metabolism, Part B: Methanotrophy, US, ACADEMIC PRESS, (20110101), vol. 495, pages 135 - 147, doi:10.1016/B978-0-12-386905-0.00009-7, ISBN 978-0-12-386905-0, XP055445713 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/B978-0-12-386905-0.00009-7 | [A] - COUFAL D E ET AL, "Sequencing and analysis of the Methylococcus capsulatus (Bath) soluble methane monooxygenase genes", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMISTRY, PUBLISHED BY SPRINGER-VERLAG ON BEHALF OF THE FEDERATION OF EUROPEAN BIOCHEMICAL SOCIETIES, (20000101), vol. 267, doi:10.1046/J.1432-1327.2000.01210.X, ISSN 0014-2956, pages 2174 - 2185, XP002540703 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1432-1327.2000.01210.x | International search | [XA]WO2017087731 (IND MICROBES INC [US]) [X] 1, 2, (16-20)/(1, 2) * para [008], [0012], [0013],[0014], [0019], [0021], [0023], [0069] * [A] 3, (16-20)/3; | [A] - KOPP et al., "Structural Features of Covalently Cross-linked Hydroxylase and Reductase Proteins of Soluble Methane Monooxygenase as Revealed by Mass Spectrometric Analysis", J Biol Chem., (20030606), vol. 278, no. 23, pages 20939 - 20945, XP055564131 [A] 3, (16-20)/3 * , Especially pg 20939 col 2 para 3, pg 20940 col 1 para 2, pg 20941 col 2 para 4 - pg 20942 col 2 para 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M301581200 |