EP3651305 - CHAINED MULTI-PORT GRID-CONNECTED INTERFACE APPARATUS AND CONTROL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.04.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.04.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.05.2023 [2023/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NR Electric Co., Ltd. No.69 Suyuan Avenue Jiangning District Nanjing, Jiangsu 211106 / CN | For all designated states NR Engineering Co., Ltd No. 69 Suyuan Avenue Jiangning Nanjing, Jiangsu 211106 / CN | [2020/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XIE, Yeyuan No. 69 Suyuan Avenue Jiangning Nanjing Jiangsu 211106 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Yu No. 69 Suyuan Avenue Jiangning Nanjing Jiangsu 211106 / CN | 03 /
LI, Haiying No. 69 Suyuan Avenue Jiangning Nanjing Jiangsu 211106 / CN | 04 /
LIAN, Jianyang No. 69 Suyuan Avenue Jiangning Nanjing Jiangsu 211106 / CN | 05 /
ZHANG, Zhongfeng No. 69 Suyuan Avenue Jiangning Nanjing Jiangsu 211106 / CN | 06 /
TIAN, Jie No. 69 Suyuan Avenue Jiangning Nanjing Jiangsu 211106 / CN | [2020/20] | Representative(s) | Kurig, Thomas Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/20] | Kurig, Thomas Becker & Kurig Partnerschaft Patentanwälte PartmbB Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18828186.9 | 19.04.2018 | [2020/20] | WO2018CN83773 | Priority number, date | CN201710544441 | 06.07.2017 Original published format: CN201710544441 | [2020/20] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019007135 | Date: | 10.01.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3651305 | Date: | 13.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 10.01.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H02J3/38, // H02M1/00, H02M7/483, H02M3/335, H02M7/5387 | [2021/02] | CPC: |
H02J3/381 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H02M1/0074 (EP,KR);
H02M1/008 (EP,KR);
H02M1/0095 (EP,KR,US);
H02M3/33507 (KR);
H02M3/33576 (KR,US);
H02M3/33584 (EP,KR);
H02M7/4835 (EP,KR,US);
H02M7/493 (KR);
H02M7/5387 (EP,KR);
H02M7/53871 (KR,US);
H02J2300/24 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H02J2300/28 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H02J2300/40 (EP,KR);
H02J2310/10 (EP,KR);
Y02E10/56 (EP,KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/20] | H02J3/38 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/20] | Title | German: | VERKETTETE NETZVERBUNDENE SCHNITTSTELLENVORRICHTUNG MIT MEHREREN ANSCHLÜSSEN UND STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN | [2020/20] | English: | CHAINED MULTI-PORT GRID-CONNECTED INTERFACE APPARATUS AND CONTROL METHOD | [2020/20] | French: | APPAREIL D'INTERFACE CONNECTÉ À UN RÉSEAU À PORTS MULTIPLES EN CHAÎNE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE | [2020/20] | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.2020 | Translation filed | 02.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.2020 | Search fee paid | 02.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/20] | 28.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/21] | 20.01.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]DE102010039640 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,5,8,14,17 * paragraphs [0004] , [00 7] , [0 22]; figures 1, 4 * [A] 7 [Y] 6,11,15,16,18-20 [I] 3,9,10,12,13; | [A]US2013343089 (GUPTA RANJAN KUMAR [US], et al) [A] 1-20* figure 9 *; | [YA]CN104753322 (STATE GRID CORP CHINA, et al) [Y] 18-20 * figures 1, 2 * [A] 1-17; | [YA]US2016261205 (KOLAR JOHANN [CH], et al) [Y] 6,11,15,16 * paragraph [0404]; figures 5, 92, 102 * [A] 1-5,8-10,12-14,17-20; | [XAI] - YUAN LIQIANG ET AL, "Scenario simulated experimental platform of AC-DC hybrid multi-port energy router for power distribution networks", 2016 19TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ELECTRICAL MACHINES AND SYSTEMS (ICEMS), THE INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS OF JAPAN, (20161113), pages 1 - 6, XP033054182 [X] 1,7,8,17 * figures 1, 2 * [A] 2,4-6,11,14-16,18-20 [I] 3,9,10,12,13 | International search | [A]US2010156189 (FISHMAN OLEG S [US])[A] 1-20; | [A]CN205265555U (SUNGROW POWER SUPPLY CO LTD) [A] 1-20; | [A]CN105960746 (RENSSELAER POLYTECH INST) [A] 1-20; | [PX]CN107276125 (NARI RELAYS ELECTRIC CO LTD, et al) [PX] 1-20; | [PX]CN207010253U (NARI RELAYS ELECTRIC CO LTD, et al) [PX] 1-11, 17-20 |