EP3649592 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR CONTENT SHARING THROUGH EXTERNAL SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 09.05.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2025 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 12.03.2025 [2025/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Open Text SA ULC 1959 Upper Water Street, Suite 900 Halifax, NS B3J 2X2 / CA | [2020/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAWA, Raja Elias 759 Long Point Circle Ottawa, Ontario K1T 4H5 / CA | 02 /
TEMPLETON, David Andrew 25 Oxford Street West PO Box 290 Drumbo, Ontario N0J 1G0 / CA | [2020/20] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [2020/20] | Application number, filing date | 18828646.2 | 05.07.2018 | [2020/20] | WO2018CA50821 | Priority number, date | US201762529617P | 07.07.2017 Original published format: US 201762529617 P | US201815902311 | 22.02.2018 Original published format: US201815902311 | [2020/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019006552 | Date: | 10.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3649592 | Date: | 13.05.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.01.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3649592 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 10.01.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/10 | [2021/15] | CPC: |
G06F16/183 (EP,CN,US);
H04L67/1095 (EP,CN,US);
G06F16/176 (EP,CN,US);
G06F16/1774 (US);
G06F16/178 (US);
G06F3/0481 (EP,CN,US);
G06F3/0482 (EP,CN,US);
G06F3/0484 (US);
G06F40/166 (US);
G06F40/197 (EP,CN,US);
G06F9/541 (US);
G06F9/544 (US);
G06F9/547 (US);
H04L41/12 (US);
H04L41/22 (US);
H04L43/045 (US);
H04L67/10 (US);
H04L67/01 (US);
|
Former IPC [2020/20] | G06Q10/10, G06F17/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR GEMEINSAMEN NUTZUNG VON INHALTEN DURCH EXTERNE SYSTEME | [2020/20] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR CONTENT SHARING THROUGH EXTERNAL SYSTEMS | [2020/20] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE PARTAGE DE CONTENU PAR LE BIAIS DE SYSTÈMES EXTERNES | [2020/20] | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.2020 | Search fee paid | 24.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/20] | 11.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.07.2023 | BG | 26.07.2023 | CZ | 26.07.2023 | DK | 26.07.2023 | EE | 26.07.2023 | ES | 26.07.2023 | FI | 26.07.2023 | HR | 26.07.2023 | IT | 26.07.2023 | LT | 26.07.2023 | LV | 26.07.2023 | MC | 26.07.2023 | NL | 26.07.2023 | PL | 26.07.2023 | RO | 26.07.2023 | RS | 26.07.2023 | SE | 26.07.2023 | SI | 26.07.2023 | SK | 26.07.2023 | SM | 26.07.2023 | NO | 26.10.2023 | GR | 27.10.2023 | IS | 26.11.2023 | PT | 27.11.2023 | [2025/11] |
Former [2024/51] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
BG | 26.07.2023 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
ES | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
IT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SI | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/36] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
ES | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
IT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SI | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
ES | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
IT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
ES | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 26.07.2023 | |
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/05] | NL | 26.07.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1517260 (GROOVE NETWORKS INC [US]); | [A]US2013173532 (XIE YONG [CN]); | [A]US2015100503 (LOBO SANJAY [US], et al) | International search | [A]US2009320035 (AHLGREN JANET [US], et al); |