EP3650182 - BOARD CORE OF ARTIFICIAL BOARD AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.01.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.02.2022 [2022/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zhenjiang Sunsier Dendro Technology Co., Ltd. Liuyan Industrial Park Danjin Road Yunyang Avenue Danyang, Jiangsu 212355 / CN | [2020/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUN, Yi Liuyan Industrial Park Danjin Road Yunyang Community Danyang Zhenjiang Jiangsu 212355 / CN | 02 /
CHEN, Hao c/o ZHENJIANG SUNSIER DENDRO TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD. Danjin Road 212355 Danyang Zhenjiang Jiangsu / CN | 03 /
WU, Jian c/o ZHENJIANG SUNSIER DENDRO TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD. Danjin Road 212355 Danyang Zhenjiang Jiangsu / CN | [2020/23] |
Former [2020/20] | 01 /
SUN, Yi Liuyan Industrial Park Danjin Road Yunyang Community Danyang Zhenjiang Jiangsu 212355 / CN | ||
02 /
CHEN, Hao Liuyan Industrial Park Danjin Road Yunyang Community Danyang Zhenjiang Jiangsu 212355 / CN | |||
03 /
WU, Jian Liuyan Industrial Park Danjin Road Yunyang Community Danyang Zhenjiang Jiangsu 212355 / CN | Representative(s) | Detken, Andreas Isler & Pedrazzini AG Giesshübelstrasse 45 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [2020/20] | Application number, filing date | 18829124.9 | 04.07.2018 | [2020/20] | WO2018CN94445 | Priority number, date | CN201710542859 | 05.07.2017 Original published format: CN201710542859 | CN201810387453 | 26.04.2018 Original published format: CN201810387453 | [2020/20] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019007357 | Date: | 10.01.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3650182 | Date: | 13.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 10.01.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B27D1/04, B27D1/06, B27D1/08 | [2020/20] | CPC: |
B32B21/13 (EP,US);
B27D1/08 (EP,US);
B27D1/04 (EP);
B27D1/06 (EP,US);
B32B21/14 (EP);
B32B3/08 (EP);
B32B3/10 (EP);
B27K2240/30 (US);
B32B2307/3065 (EP);
B32B2307/732 (EP);
B32B2317/16 (EP,US);
B32B37/10 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/20] | Title | German: | PLATTENKERN AUS KUNSTKARTON UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2020/20] | English: | BOARD CORE OF ARTIFICIAL BOARD AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME | [2020/20] | French: | NOYAU DE PANNEAU D'UN PANNEAU ARTIFICIEL ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2020/20] | Entry into regional phase | 13.01.2020 | Translation filed | 13.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 13.01.2020 | Search fee paid | 13.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/20] | 15.09.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/08] | 05.10.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2021 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]KR20160074980 (KOREA INST CIVIL ENGINEERING & BUILDING TECHNOLOGY [KR]) [X] 1 * abstract * [I] 2-16; | [XI]AT507249 (BERGER JOHANN [AT]) [X] 9 * page 11, line 7 - page 12, line 2; figures 5,12; claim 19 * * page 9, paragraph 4; figure 4 * [I] 1-8,10-16; | [A]WO2007048149 (BERGER JOHANN [AT]) [A] 1-16 * figures 3,12 * | International search | [X]CN104070567 (SUN YI) [X] 1-16; | [A]JP2896499B (FORESTRY & FOREST RES INST) [A] 1-16; | [A]CN102233600 (SHENZHEN PULAN TAISEN NEW MATERIAL TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-16; | [A]CN201235568Y (YUKUN QI [CN]) [A] 1-16; | [A]US5456781 (TINGLEY DANIEL A [US]) [A] 1-16; | [A]CN103171003 (LINTEX COMPOSITES CO LTD) [A] 1-16; | [A]CN201516630U (HUAQING LIU) [A] 1-16 | by applicant | CN202021653U | CN104070567 | CN103659998 | CN202021651U |