EP3723938 - NOZZLE ARRANGEMENT AND MACHINE TOOL COMPRISING A NOZZLE ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.08.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fritz Studer AG Thunstrasse 15 3612 Steffisburg / CH | [2020/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HABEGGER, Martin Simmenfluhweg 16 3647 Reutigen / CH | 02 /
RENFER, Daniel Lobhornweg 1 3661 Uetendorf / CH | 03 /
BAUMGART, Christoph Eichenweg 14 8802 Kilchberg / CH | [2020/43] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/43] | Application number, filing date | 18829259.3 | 12.12.2018 | [2020/43] | WO2018EP84619 | Priority number, date | DE201710129840 | 13.12.2017 Original published format: DE102017129840 | [2020/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2019115641 | Date: | 20.06.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3723938 | Date: | 21.10.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.08.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q11/10, B05B1/14, B05B15/65, F16L37/00 | [2023/39] | CPC: |
B23Q11/1076 (EP);
B05B1/14 (EP);
B05B12/008 (EP);
B05B15/65 (EP);
B05B15/68 (EP);
B05B9/0423 (EP);
F16L37/144 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/43] | B23Q11/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/43] | Title | German: | DÜSENANORDNUNG UND WERKZEUGMASCHINE MIT EINER DÜSENANORDNUNG | [2020/43] | English: | NOZZLE ARRANGEMENT AND MACHINE TOOL COMPRISING A NOZZLE ARRANGEMENT | [2020/43] | French: | AGENCEMENT DE BUSES ET MACHINE-OUTIL COMPORTANT UN AGENCEMENT DE BUSES | [2020/43] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/43] | 09.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division to which search results under Rule 164(2) EPC are annexed (Time limit: M04) [2023/39] | 25.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1495840 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]); | [A]WO2009148680 (GEN ELECTRIC [US], et al); | [A]WO2011106801 (SAINT GOBAIN ABRASIVES INC [US], et al); | [A]US2016297042 (KOIK ERIK [US], et al); | [Y]US2017203401 (DESJARDIEN MATTHEW R [US], et al); | [XYI]DE102016103202 (KLINGELNBERG AG [CH]) | by applicant | EP1772233 | DE102016103202 |