EP3727610 - PNEUMATIC CONTROL DEVICE FOR MULTI-ZONE FIRE EXTINGUISHING SYSTEMS, AND MULTI-ZONE FIRE-EXTINGUISHING SYSTEMS HAVING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.10.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.05.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.05.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.07.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.2024 | Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Minimax GmbH Industriestraße 10-12 23843 Bad Oldesloe / DE | [2022/04] |
Former [2020/44] | For all designated states Minimax GmbH & Co. KG Industriestrasse 10/12 23840 Bad Oldesloe / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NÖTZEL, Thomas Waisenhofstraße 13a 23554 Lübeck / DE | 02 /
CLAESSEN, Thomas Westfalenstraße 23 41564 Kaarst / DE | [2020/44] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [2020/44] | Application number, filing date | 18829366.6 | 19.12.2018 | [2020/44] | WO2018EP85998 | Priority number, date | DE201710130587 | 19.12.2017 Original published format: DE102017130587 | [2020/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019122022 | Date: | 27.06.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3727610 | Date: | 28.10.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A62C37/46 | [2020/44] | CPC: |
A62C37/46 (EP,US);
A62C35/68 (US);
A62C37/40 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/44] | Title | German: | PNEUMATISCHES STEUERGERÄT FÜR MEHRBEREICHS-FEUERLÖSCHANLAGEN, SOWIE MEHRBEREICHS-FEUERLÖSCHANLAGE MIT SELBIGEM | [2020/44] | English: | PNEUMATIC CONTROL DEVICE FOR MULTI-ZONE FIRE EXTINGUISHING SYSTEMS, AND MULTI-ZONE FIRE-EXTINGUISHING SYSTEMS HAVING SAME | [2020/44] | French: | APPAREIL DE COMMANDE PNEUMATIQUE POUR DES INSTALLATIONS D'EXTINCTION D'INCENDIE MULTIZONE, AINSI QU'INSTALLATION D'EXTINCTION D'INCENDIE MULTIZONE LE COMPRENANT | [2020/44] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/44] | 20.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.12.2023 | 13.12.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 08.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 31.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2023569 (ALLEN SCOTT E, et al); | [Y]US2004055764 (BOWYER JAMES [US], et al); | [Y]EP2289600 (KIDDE TECH INC [US]); | [A]DE102010013805 (FUCHS PETER [DE]) |