EP3717702 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PROCESSING A SURFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Art En Reno BVBA Draaiboom 84 2360 Oud-Turnhout / BE | [2024/15] |
Former [2020/41] | For all designated states Art En Reno BVBA Draaiboom 84 2360 Oud-Turnhout / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAX, Franciscus Andreas Anna Maria Draaiboom 84 2360 Oud-Turnhout / BE | 02 /
NOEYENS, Linda Anna Emiel Draaiboom 84 2360 Oud-Turnhout / BE | [2020/41] | Representative(s) | Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [2020/41] | Application number, filing date | 18829477.1 | 29.11.2018 | [2020/41] | WO2018IB59461 | Priority number, date | NL20172019994 | 29.11.2017 Original published format: NL 2019994 | [2020/41] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019106598 | Date: | 06.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3717702 | Date: | 07.10.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3717702 | Date: | 10.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | E01C23/088, B28D1/18 | [2020/41] | CPC: |
E01C23/0885 (EP,US);
B28D1/181 (EP);
B28D1/28 (US);
E01C23/094 (US);
F16F15/124 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEARBEITUNG EINER OBERFLÄCHE | [2020/41] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PROCESSING A SURFACE | [2020/41] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LE TRAITEMENT D'UNE SURFACE | [2020/41] | Entry into regional phase | 29.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 29.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/41] | 29.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2004154 (BEATTY WILFRID J); | [A]GB845659 (COLUMBUS DIXON LTD); | [A]US4668017 (PETERSON CLAYTON R [US], et al); | [A]DE102010014711 (STREET CUT GMBH [DE]); | [A]US2016207170 (FOGELBERG ANDREAS [SE]) |