EP3802453 - RADIATION CURABLE COMPOSITIONS FOR COATING OPTICAL FIBER AND THE COATINGS PRODUCED THEREFROM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.05.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.12.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covestro (Netherlands) B.V. Urmonderbaan 22 6167 RD Geleen / NL | [2022/13] |
Former [2021/43] | For all designated states Covestro (Netherlands) B.V. Ratelaar 39F 3434 EW Nieuwegein / NL | ||
Former [2021/15] | For all designated states DSM IP Assets B.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEEMAN, Paulus Antonius Maria P.O.Box 4 6100 AA Echt / NL | 02 /
WU, Xiaosong DSM Functional Materials 1122 St. Charles Street Elgin, Illinois 60120 / US | 03 /
BOGAERDS, Adrianus Cornelis Bastiaan P.O.Box 4 6100 AA Echt / NL | 04 /
PEPELS, Mark Petrus Franciscus P.O.Box 4 6100 AA Echt / NL | 05 /
HENSEN, Guido Joseph Elisabeth P.O.Box 4 6100 AA Echt / NL | [2021/16] |
Former [2021/15] | 01 /
STEEMAN, Paulus Antonius Maria P.O.Box 4 6100 AA Echt / NL | ||
02 /
WU, Xiaosong DSM Functional Materials 1122 St. Charles Street Elgin, Illinois 60120 / US | |||
03 /
BOGAERDS, Adrianus Cornelis Bastiaan P.O.Box 4 6100 AA Echt / NL | |||
04 /
PEPELS, Mark Petrus Franciscus P.O.Box 4 6100 AA Echt / NL | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2021/15] | Application number, filing date | 18829573.7 | 03.12.2018 | [2021/15] | WO2018US63577 | Priority number, date | US201862679383P | 01.06.2018 Original published format: US 201862679383 P | [2021/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019231491 | Date: | 05.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3802453 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C03C25/1065, C09D175/16, G02B6/02, G02B6/44, C08G18/48, C08G18/73, C08G18/75, C08G18/76, C08G18/24, C08F290/06 | [2021/15] | CPC: |
C03C25/1065 (EP,KR);
C08F290/067 (EP,KR,US);
C09D175/14 (CN);
C08F2/48 (KR);
C08F2/50 (US);
C08G18/246 (EP,KR);
C08G18/34 (US);
C08G18/4825 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/4854 (EP,KR);
C08G18/672 (EP,KR);
C08G18/755 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/758 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/7621 (EP,KR,US);
C09D175/16 (EP,KR,US);
G02B6/02004 (EP,KR);
| C-Set: |
C08G18/672, C08G18/48 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/15] | Title | German: | STRAHLUNGSHÄRTBARE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR BESCHICHTUNG VON OPTISCHEN FASERN UND DARAUS HERGESTELLTE BESCHICHTUNGEN | [2021/15] | English: | RADIATION CURABLE COMPOSITIONS FOR COATING OPTICAL FIBER AND THE COATINGS PRODUCED THEREFROM | [2021/15] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DURCISSABLES PAR RAYONNEMENT POUR REVÊTEMENT DE FIBRE OPTIQUE ET REVÊTEMENTS PRODUITS À PARTIR DE CELLES-CI | [2021/15] | Entry into regional phase | 30.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 30.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/15] | 30.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9959930 (DSM NV [NL]); | [A]WO02053509 (DSM NV [NL], et al); | [X]US2002146225 (BULTERS MARKUS J H [NL], et al); | [A]WO03091781 (PIRELLI [IT], et al); | [A]WO2005026228 (DSM IP ASSESTS BV [NL], et al); | [E]WO2018220605 (DSM IP ASSETS BV [NL]) | by applicant | US3004896 | US3055896 | US3072585 | US3074910 | US3189615 | US3218332 | US3230194 | US4127586 | US4226763 | US4275004 | US4278589 | US4315848 | US4324744 | US4347180 | US4383863 | US4474830 | GB2180358 | US4675352 | US4681905 | US4737593 | US4753817 | US4851165 | US4853471 | US4962992 | US5013768 | EP0438123 | US5104433 | US5229253 | US5268450 | US5278314 | US5280124 | US5319091 | US5410071 | US5436349 | US5516914 | US5534559 | US5554760 | US5563242 | US5574166 | US5607987 | US5942290 | US5977219 | US6020529 | US6020528 | US6048660 | US6166218 | US6486228 | US6486226 | US6596445 | US6689463 | US6775451 | US6916855 | US6961508 | US7171103 | US2007100039 | US7706659 | US8837892 | US2014294355 | US2015071595 | US20030498848 |