EP3897270 - SHOE UPPER, ESPECIALLY FOR A SPORTS SHOE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.03.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.01.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.07.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PUMA SE PUMA Way 1 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | [2021/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THOMPSON, James Merkelsgasse 13 90489 Nürnberg / DE | 02 /
COCKS, Lilly Untere Söldnersgasse 8 90403 Nürnberg / DE | [2021/43] | Representative(s) | Gosdin, Carstensen & Partner Patentanwälte Partnerschaftgesellschaft mbB Adam-Stegerwald-Straße 6 97422 Schweinfurt / DE | [2021/43] | Application number, filing date | 18829829.3 | 19.12.2018 | [2021/43] | WO2018EP86032 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020125983 | Date: | 25.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3897270 | Date: | 27.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3897270 | Date: | 27.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A43B23/02, A43C1/00, A43C3/00, A43C5/00 | [2021/43] | CPC: |
A43C1/003 (EP);
A43B23/0245 (EP,US);
A43C3/00 (EP);
A43C5/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHUHOBERTEIL, INSBESONDERE FÜR EINEN SPORTSCHUH | [2021/43] | English: | SHOE UPPER, ESPECIALLY FOR A SPORTS SHOE | [2021/43] | French: | TIGE DE CHAUSSURE, EN PARTICULIER POUR UNE CHAUSSURE DE SPORT | [2021/43] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/43] | 19.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.01.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.12.2018 | AL | 27.04.2022 | AT | 27.04.2022 | CY | 27.04.2022 | CZ | 27.04.2022 | EE | 27.04.2022 | HR | 27.04.2022 | LT | 27.04.2022 | LV | 27.04.2022 | MC | 27.04.2022 | MK | 27.04.2022 | NL | 27.04.2022 | PL | 27.04.2022 | RO | 27.04.2022 | RS | 27.04.2022 | SK | 27.04.2022 | SM | 27.04.2022 | BG | 27.07.2022 | GR | 28.07.2022 | IS | 27.08.2022 | PT | 29.08.2022 | IE | 19.12.2022 | LU | 19.12.2022 | BE | 31.12.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/27] | HU | 19.12.2018 | |
AL | 27.04.2022 | ||
AT | 27.04.2022 | ||
CY | 27.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
MK | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
IE | 19.12.2022 | ||
LU | 19.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/24] | HU | 19.12.2018 | |
AL | 27.04.2022 | ||
AT | 27.04.2022 | ||
CY | 27.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
IE | 19.12.2022 | ||
LU | 19.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 27.04.2022 | |
AT | 27.04.2022 | ||
CY | 27.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
IE | 19.12.2022 | ||
LU | 19.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 27.04.2022 | |
AT | 27.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
IE | 19.12.2022 | ||
LU | 19.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 27.04.2022 | |
AT | 27.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
IE | 19.12.2022 | ||
LU | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 27.04.2022 | |
AT | 27.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
LU | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 27.04.2022 | |
AT | 27.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | NL | 27.04.2022 | Cited in | International search | [XAI]FR2835405 (THOMASSIN ARNAUD MICHEL NICOLA [FR], et al) [X] 1,9 * page 2, line 1 - line 32 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 4-8,12-15 [I] 2,3,10,11; | [XI]WO2017067566 (PUMA SE [DE]) [X] 1-3,9,13 * page 5, line 28 - page 8, line 19 * * figures 1-7 * [I] 10,11,14; | [XI]US2018255877 (WILSON REGGIE [US]) [X] 1,2,9 * figures 3A, 3B *[I] 10,11 | by applicant | WO2016095938 |