Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11451838 | Global Dossier | 20.09.2022 | B2 | US2021385514 | 09.12.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018EP83926 | 07.12.2018 | EP17205979 | 07.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3721636 | Global Dossier | 14.10.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018EP83926 | 07.12.2018 | EP17205979 | 07.12.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019110779 | Global Dossier | 13.06.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP17205979 | 07.12.2017 |