EP3723960 - CONTAINER WITH LID HAVING FLUORINATED POLYMER INTERNAL SURFACE AND METHODS FOR MAKING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.02.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CSP Technologies, Inc. 960 West Veterans Boulevard Auburn, Alabama 36832 / US | [2020/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUCAS, Franklin Lee, Jr. c/o CSP TECHNOLOGIES, INC. 960 West Veterans Boulevard Auburn, Alabama 36832 / US | 02 /
SPANO, William Frederick c/o CSP TECHNOLOGIES, INC. 960 West Veterans Boulevard Auburn, Alabama 36832 / US | 03 /
HOLLINGER, James S. c/o CSP TECHNOLOGIES, INC. 960 West Veterans Boulevard Auburn, Alabama 36832 / US | 04 /
PRATT, Jason c/o CSP TECHNOLOGIES, INC. 960 West Veterans Boulevard Auburn, Alabama 36832 / US | [2020/43] | Representative(s) | Berggren Oy P.O. Box 16 Eteläinen Rautatiekatu 10A 00101 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2020/43] | Berggren Oy, Tampere Visiokatu 1 33720 Tampere / FI | Application number, filing date | 18830625.2 | 14.12.2018 | [2020/43] | WO2018US65729 | Priority number, date | US201762598994P | 14.12.2017 Original published format: US 201762598994 P | [2020/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019118865 | Date: | 20.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3723960 | Date: | 21.10.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/14, B65D5/66, B32B3/06, B32B15/20, B32B27/32, B32B27/34, B32B27/36, B65D50/04, B65D43/16, B65D25/14, // B29L31/00, B29K27/12, B65D81/00, B32B1/00, B32B7/12, B32B27/08, B32B27/28, B32B15/085 | [2024/09] | CPC: |
B29C45/14811 (EP,US);
B29C45/14688 (US);
B29C45/14311 (US);
B32B1/00 (EP);
B32B15/085 (EP);
B32B15/20 (EP);
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
B32B27/283 (EP);
B32B27/32 (EP);
B32B27/322 (EP);
B32B27/34 (EP);
B32B27/36 (EP);
B32B3/06 (EP);
B32B7/12 (EP,US);
B65D25/14 (EP,US);
B65D43/162 (EP,US);
B65D50/045 (EP);
B65D50/046 (US);
B65D65/40 (US);
B65D81/00 (EP);
B29C2045/14319 (EP,US);
B29C2045/14918 (EP,US);
B29K2027/12 (EP,US);
B29L2031/712 (EP);
B29L2031/7162 (EP,US);
B32B2255/10 (EP);
B32B2307/412 (EP);
B32B2307/518 (EP);
B32B2307/558 (EP);
B32B2307/5825 (EP);
B32B2307/732 (EP);
B32B2307/738 (EP);
B32B2307/748 (EP);
B32B2439/40 (EP);
B32B2439/62 (US);
B65D2215/02 (EP);
B65D2543/00101 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00296 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00518 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00537 (US);
B65D2543/00546 (EP);
B65D2543/00666 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/43] | B29C45/00, B29C45/14, B65D5/66, B29L31/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/43] | Title | German: | BEHÄLTER MIT DECKEL, DER EINE FLUORIERTESPOLYMER ALS INNERE SCHICHT HAT UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2021/18] | English: | CONTAINER WITH LID HAVING FLUORINATED POLYMER INTERNAL SURFACE AND METHODS FOR MAKING THE SAME | [2020/43] | French: | CONTENEUR AVEC UNE COUVERTURE, COMPRENANT UN SURFACE INTERIEUR À UN POLYMER FLUORIDIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE SA FABRICATION | [2021/18] |
Former [2020/43] | BEHÄLTER MIT DECKEL MIT FLUORIERTER POLYMERINNENFLÄCHE UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | ||
Former [2020/43] | RÉCIPIENT À COUVERCLE PRÉSENTANT UNE SURFACE INTERNE EN POLYMÈRE FLUORÉ ET PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION ASSOCIÉS | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/43] | 13.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2020 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   25.02.2021 | 31.12.2023 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2003067099 (MILLER DALE [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0041] , [0036] , [0023] , [0047] , [0133]; figures 1,(5); claims 3,9,18 * * paragraphs [0107] , [0109] * * paragraph [0067] * [I] 2-17; | [A]US2007163990 (ESCOBOSA ROBERTO [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * paragraphs [0036] , [0055] , [0024] - paragraphs [0026] , [0020] * * paragraph [0047] *; | [A]US2017112181 (BELFANCE JOHN [US], et al) [A] 14-21* the whole document *; | [I]EP3181353 (KURARAY CO [JP]) [I] 1-17 * paragraphs [0177] , [0178] , [0189] , [0159] - paragraphs [0163] , [0176] , [0183] , [0148] * | by applicant | WO2018204794 |