EP3723608 - SENSOR MONITORING SYSTEM FOR IN-DWELLING CATHETER BASED TREATMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.11.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gastroklenz Inc. 665 3rd Street, Suite 250 San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | [2023/41] |
Former [2020/43] | For all designated states Gastroklenz Inc. 665 3rd Street, Suite 250 San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ELBADRY, Aly, R. 45 Lansing Street, Apt. 1912 San Francisco, CA 94105 / US | 02 /
YU, Eric, Hsiang 260 King Street, Unit 955 San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | 03 /
SALEH, Ahmad, Naim 1211 Margery Avenue San Leandro, CA 94578 / US | 04 /
SNYDER, Michael, Austin 1642 Wildflower Trail San Angelo, TX 76904 / US | [2020/43] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [2023/41] |
Former [2020/43] | Cooley (UK) LLP Dashwood 69 Old Broad Street London EC2M 1QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 18830641.9 | 14.12.2018 | [2020/43] | WO2018US65853 | Priority number, date | US201762599619P | 15.12.2017 Original published format: US 201762599619 P | US201862731339P | 14.09.2018 Original published format: US 201862731339 P | [2020/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019118929 | Date: | 20.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3723608 | Date: | 21.10.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3723608 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/145, A61B5/00, A61B5/1455, A61B5/1459, A61B5/026 | [2020/43] | CPC: |
A61B5/4836 (EP);
A61M1/361 (US);
A61B5/0059 (EP);
A61B5/14546 (EP,US);
A61B5/1459 (EP);
A61M1/28 (US);
A61M1/3663 (US);
G01N15/06 (EP);
A61B2562/0233 (US);
A61B5/0261 (EP);
A61B5/1455 (US);
A61B5/6866 (US);
A61M2205/3313 (US);
A61M2205/3584 (US);
A61M2230/20 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SENSORÜBERWACHUNGSSYSTEM FÜR VERWEILKATHETERBASIERTE BEHANDLUNGEN | [2020/43] | English: | SENSOR MONITORING SYSTEM FOR IN-DWELLING CATHETER BASED TREATMENTS | [2020/43] | French: | SYSTÈME DE SURVEILLANCE DE CAPTEUR POUR TRAITEMENTS À BASE DE CATHÉTER À DEMEURE | [2020/43] | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 01.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/43] | 01.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.11.2022 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 29.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 21.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.10.2023 | CZ | 11.10.2023 | DK | 11.10.2023 | EE | 11.10.2023 | ES | 11.10.2023 | HR | 11.10.2023 | IT | 11.10.2023 | LT | 11.10.2023 | LV | 11.10.2023 | MC | 11.10.2023 | NL | 11.10.2023 | PL | 11.10.2023 | RO | 11.10.2023 | RS | 11.10.2023 | SK | 11.10.2023 | SM | 11.10.2023 | LU | 14.12.2023 | BG | 11.01.2024 | NO | 11.01.2024 | GR | 12.01.2024 | IS | 11.02.2024 | PT | 12.02.2024 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
CZ | 11.10.2023 | ||
DK | 11.10.2023 | ||
EE | 11.10.2023 | ||
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
IT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RO | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SK | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
CZ | 11.10.2023 | ||
DK | 11.10.2023 | ||
EE | 11.10.2023 | ||
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RO | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
DK | 11.10.2023 | ||
EE | 11.10.2023 | ||
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
DK | 11.10.2023 | ||
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 11.10.2023 | |
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 11.10.2023 | |
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 11.10.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2003142291 (PADMANABHAN ARAVIND [US], et al); | [X]WO2010056740 (BECKMAN COULTER INC [US], et al); | [A]WO2014163815 (EDWARDS LIFESCIENCES CORP [US]); | [X]US2014329265 (WANDERS BART J [US], et al); | [A]WO2016046634 (SOFRADIM PRODUCTION [FR]); | [A]US2017181678 (NEWBERRY ROBERT STEVEN [US]); | [X]WO2017132132 (BECKMAN COULTER INC [US]) | Examination | US9297816 | US2016151055 |